Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2019 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Watson S.B. No. 2019
 (In the Senate - Filed March 12, 2009; March 24, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources;
 April 14, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 10,
 Nays 0; April 14, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the use of certain refrigerants in motor vehicle air
 conditioning units.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subsection (a), Section 547.610, Transportation
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (a) Air-conditioning equipment:
 (1) shall be manufactured, installed, and maintained
 to ensure the safety of the vehicle occupants and the public; and
 (2) may not contain any refrigerant that is flammable
 or is toxic to persons unless the refrigerant is included in the
 list published by the United States Environmental Protection Agency
 as a safe alternative motor vehicle air conditioning substitute for
 chlorofluorocarbon-12, pursuant to 42 U.S.C. Section 7671k(c).
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *