Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB202 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Shapleigh S.B. No. 202
 (In the Senate - Filed November 10, 2008; February 11, 2009,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human
 Services; March 2, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 March 2, 2009, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 202 By: Shapleigh


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to provisional licensing of physicians to practice in
 underserved areas.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter C, Chapter 155, Occupations Code, is
 amended by adding Section 155.101 to read as follows:
 Sec. 155.101.  PROVISIONAL LICENSE TO PRACTICE IN CERTAIN
 AREAS.  (a)  On application, the board shall grant a provisional
 license to practice medicine in a location described by Subsection
 (e) to an applicant for a license under this subtitle who is
 licensed in good standing as a physician in another state.
 (b)  The board may not grant a provisional license under this
 section to an applicant who:
 (1)  has had a medical license suspended or revoked by
 another state or a Canadian province; or
 (2)  holds a medical license issued by another state or
 a Canadian province that is subject to a restriction, disciplinary
 order, or probationary order.
 (c) The provisional license applicant must:
 (1)  have passed a national or other examination
 recognized by the board relating to the practice of medicine within
 the number of attempts allowed under Section 155.056;
 (2)  submit information to enable the board to conduct
 a criminal background check as required by the board; and
 (3)  be sponsored by a person licensed under this
 subtitle with whom the provisional license holder may practice
 under this section.
 (d)  The board may excuse an applicant for a provisional
 license from the requirement of Subsection (c)(3) if the board
 determines that compliance with that subsection constitutes a
 hardship to the applicant.
 (e)  A person who holds a provisional license issued under
 this section may only practice medicine in a location:
 (1)  designated by the federal government as a health
 professional shortage area; or
 (2)  designated by the federal or state government as a
 medically underserved area.
 (f) A provisional license expires on the earlier of:
 (1)  the date the board issues the provisional license
 holder a license under this subtitle or denies the provisional
 license holder's application for a license; or
 (2)  the 270th day after the date the provisional
 license was issued.
 (g)  The board shall issue a license under this subtitle to
 the holder of a provisional license under this section if:
 (1)  the provisional license holder passes the
 examination required by Section 155.051; and
 (2)  the provisional license holder satisfies all other
 license requirements under this subtitle.
 SECTION 2. Section 155.101, Occupations Code, as added by
 this Act, applies to an application for a provisional license
 submitted on or after January 1, 2010.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *