Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB203 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Shapleigh S.B. No. 203
 (In the Senate - Filed November 10, 2008; February 11, 2009,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human
 Services; April 6, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 April 6, 2009, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 203 By: Shapleigh


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the reporting of health care-associated infections in
 certain health care facilities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subsections (a), (b), and (c), Section 98.103,
 Health and Safety Code, as added by Chapter 359 (S.B. 288), Acts of
 the 80th Legislature, Regular Session, 2007, are amended to read as
 follows:
 (a) A health care facility, other than a pediatric and
 adolescent hospital, shall report to the department the incidence
 of surgical site infections, including the causative pathogen if
 the infection is laboratory-confirmed, occurring in the following
 procedures:
 (1) colon surgeries;
 (2) hip arthroplasties;
 (3) knee arthroplasties;
 (4) abdominal hysterectomies;
 (5) vaginal hysterectomies;
 (6) coronary artery bypass grafts; and
 (7) vascular procedures.
 (b) A pediatric and adolescent hospital shall report the
 incidence of surgical site infections, including the causative
 pathogen if the infection is laboratory-confirmed, occurring in the
 following procedures to the department:
 (1) cardiac procedures, excluding thoracic cardiac
 procedures;
 (2) ventriculoperitoneal shunt procedures; and
 (3) spinal surgery with instrumentation.
 (c) A general hospital shall report the following to the
 department:
 (1) the incidence of laboratory-confirmed central
 line-associated primary bloodstream infections, including the
 causative pathogen, occurring in any special care setting in the
 hospital; and
 (2) the incidence of respiratory syncytial virus
 occurring in any pediatric inpatient unit in the hospital.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *