Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2041 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Ellis, Carona S.B. No. 2041
 (In the Senate - Filed March 12, 2009; March 31, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and Homeland
 Security; April 8, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 8, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to requiring an applicant for a driver's license to
 demonstrate knowledge of motorists' rights and responsibilities in
 relation to bicyclists.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subsections (b) and (c), Section 521.161,
 Transportation Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (b) The examination must include:
 (1) a test of the applicant's:
 (A) vision;
 (B) ability to identify and understand highway
 signs in English that regulate, warn, or direct traffic; [and]
 (C) knowledge of the traffic laws of this state;
 and
 (D)  knowledge of motorists' rights and
 responsibilities in relation to bicyclists;
 (2) a demonstration of the applicant's ability to
 exercise ordinary and reasonable control in the operation of a
 motor vehicle of the type that the applicant will be licensed to
 operate; and
 (3) any additional examination the department finds
 necessary to determine the applicant's fitness to operate a motor
 vehicle safely.
 (c) The department shall give each applicant the option of
 taking the parts [traffic law and highway sign part] of the
 examination under Subsections (b)(1)(B), (C), and (D) in writing in
 addition to or instead of through a mechanical, electronic, or
 other testing method. If the applicant takes that part of the
 examination in writing in addition to another testing method, the
 applicant is considered to have passed that part of the examination
 if the applicant passes either version of the examination. The
 department shall inform each person taking the examination of the
 person's rights under this subsection.
 SECTION 2. A driver's license examination administered by
 the Department of Public Safety is not required to include a
 question required by Paragraph (D), Subdivision (1), Subsection
 (b), Section 521.161, Transportation Code, as added by this Act, if
 the examination is administered before February 1, 2010.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *