Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2041 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 2041


 AN ACT
 relating to requiring an applicant for a driver's license to
 demonstrate knowledge of motorists' rights and responsibilities in
 relation to bicyclists.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subsections (b) and (c), Section 521.161,
 Transportation Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (b) The examination must include:
 (1) a test of the applicant's:
 (A) vision;
 (B) ability to identify and understand highway
 signs in English that regulate, warn, or direct traffic; [and]
 (C) knowledge of the traffic laws of this state;
 and
 (D)  knowledge of motorists' rights and
 responsibilities in relation to bicyclists;
 (2) a demonstration of the applicant's ability to
 exercise ordinary and reasonable control in the operation of a
 motor vehicle of the type that the applicant will be licensed to
 operate; and
 (3) any additional examination the department finds
 necessary to determine the applicant's fitness to operate a motor
 vehicle safely.
 (c) The department shall give each applicant the option of
 taking the parts [traffic law and highway sign part] of the
 examination under Subsections (b)(1)(B), (C), and (D) in writing in
 addition to or instead of through a mechanical, electronic, or
 other testing method. If the applicant takes that part of the
 examination in writing in addition to another testing method, the
 applicant is considered to have passed that part of the examination
 if the applicant passes either version of the examination. The
 department shall inform each person taking the examination of the
 person's rights under this subsection.
 SECTION 2. A driver's license examination administered by
 the Department of Public Safety is not required to include a
 question required by Paragraph (D), Subdivision (1), Subsection
 (b), Section 521.161, Transportation Code, as added by this Act, if
 the examination is administered before February 1, 2010.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2041 passed the Senate on
 April 23, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 29, Nays 1.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2041 passed the House on
 May 26, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 146, Nays 0, one present
 not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor