Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2043 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Williams S.B. No. 2043
 (In the Senate - Filed March 12, 2009; March 31, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on International Relations and
 Trade; April 14, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0;
 April 14, 2009, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2043 By: Williams


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the closure of certain man-made passes between the Gulf
 of Mexico and inland bays by the commissioner of the General Land
 Office.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter H, Chapter 33, Natural Resources
 Code, is amended by adding Section 33.613 to read as follows:
 Sec. 33.613.  CLOSURE OF CERTAIN MAN-MADE PASSES.
 (a)  Notwithstanding Sections 66.204 and 81.103, Parks and
 Wildlife Code, the commissioner may close a man-made pass between
 the Gulf of Mexico and an inland bay if:
 (1)  the commissioner determines that the pass causes
 or contributes to significant erosion of the shoreline of the
 adjacent beach;
 (2)  the pass is not a public navigational channel
 constructed or maintained by the federal government; and
 (3)  the land office receives legislative
 appropriations or other funding for that purpose.
 (b)  If the closing of a man-made pass under this section
 results in a loss of public recreational opportunities, the
 commissioner shall develop, in consultation with the Parks and
 Wildlife Department and the county and, if applicable, the
 municipality in which the pass is located, and approve a plan to
 mitigate the loss.  In developing the plan, the commissioner is
 strongly encouraged to assess the feasibility of installing fishing
 piers, boat ramps, and other facilities that provide public
 recreational opportunities.  The plan must be presented to the
 public for comment before the commissioner approves it.
 SECTION 2. Not later than January 1, 2011, the commissioner
 of the General Land Office shall submit to the 82nd Legislature a
 report on the progress of the commissioner in implementing any
 mitigation plan approved under Subsection (b), Section 33.613,
 Natural Resources Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *