Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2045 Senate Committee Report / Analysis

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    BILL ANALYSIS     Senate Research Center C.S.S.B. 2045 81R22927 KEL-D By: Williams  Finance  4/21/2009  Committee Report (Substituted)     AUTHOR'S / SPONSOR'S STATEMENT OF INTENT   On September 1, 1995, the Lamar Institute of Technology (LIT) was established as a separate state agency and as an educational center of Lamar University, a member of the Texas State University System. LIT received separate regional accreditation status from the Southern Association of Colleges and Schools on December 4, 2000.    In previous years, the allocation for LIT from Higher Education Funds (HEF) has been calculated in conjunction with that of Lamar University because of the language in statute naming LIT as an "educational center" of Lamar University. As a result, LIT's funding is not calculated separately because the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board's HEF Committee determined that LIT is not eligible due to it not being a "named" institution of higher education as defined by Section 17(b), Article VII, Texas Constitution, nor being named as a separate institution in the Education Code.   C.S.S.B. 2045 amends current law relating to certain constitutionally dedicated funds allocated to the Lamar Institute of Technology and to the administration of that institution.   RULEMAKING AUTHORITY   This bill does not expressly grant any additional rulemaking authority to a state officer, institution, or agency.   SECTION BY SECTION ANALYSIS   SECTION 1. Amends Section 96.703(a), Education Code, as follows:   (a) Requires the board of regents of the Texas State University System to establish and maintain in the city of Beaumont, rather than establish and maintain an educational center of Lamar University, as a separate degree-granting institution a lower-division institution of higher education to be known as Lamar Institute of Technology.    SECTION 2. Repealer: Section 96.703(c) (relating to authorizing the board to expend funds allocated to Lamar University), Education Code.   SECTION 3. Effective date: upon passage or September 1, 2009.      

BILL ANALYSIS

 

 

Senate Research Center C.S.S.B. 2045

81R22927 KEL-D By: Williams

 Finance

 4/21/2009

 Committee Report (Substituted)

 

 

AUTHOR'S / SPONSOR'S STATEMENT OF INTENT

 

On September 1, 1995, the Lamar Institute of Technology (LIT) was established as a separate state agency and as an educational center of Lamar University, a member of the Texas State University System. LIT received separate regional accreditation status from the Southern Association of Colleges and Schools on December 4, 2000. 

 

In previous years, the allocation for LIT from Higher Education Funds (HEF) has been calculated in conjunction with that of Lamar University because of the language in statute naming LIT as an "educational center" of Lamar University. As a result, LIT's funding is not calculated separately because the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board's HEF Committee determined that LIT is not eligible due to it not being a "named" institution of higher education as defined by Section 17(b), Article VII, Texas Constitution, nor being named as a separate institution in the Education Code.

 

C.S.S.B. 2045 amends current law relating to certain constitutionally dedicated funds allocated to the Lamar Institute of Technology and to the administration of that institution.

 

RULEMAKING AUTHORITY

 

This bill does not expressly grant any additional rulemaking authority to a state officer, institution, or agency.

 

SECTION BY SECTION ANALYSIS

 

SECTION 1. Amends Section 96.703(a), Education Code, as follows:

 

(a) Requires the board of regents of the Texas State University System to establish and maintain in the city of Beaumont, rather than establish and maintain an educational center of Lamar University, as a separate degree-granting institution a lower-division institution of higher education to be known as Lamar Institute of Technology. 

 

SECTION 2. Repealer: Section 96.703(c) (relating to authorizing the board to expend funds allocated to Lamar University), Education Code.

 

SECTION 3. Effective date: upon passage or September 1, 2009.