Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2065 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Davis S.B. No. 2065
 (In the Senate - Filed March 12, 2009; March 31, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Jurisprudence;
 April 14, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; April 14, 2009,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2065 By: Watson


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to proof that is acceptable for identifying individuals
 acknowledging written instruments.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subsection (a), Section 121.005, Civil Practice
 and Remedies Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (a) An officer may not take the acknowledgment of a written
 instrument unless the officer knows or has satisfactory evidence
 that the acknowledging person is the person who executed the
 instrument and is described in it. An officer may accept, as
 satisfactory evidence of the identity of an acknowledging person,
 only:
 (1) the oath of a credible witness personally known to
 the officer; or
 (2) a current identification card or other document
 issued by the federal government, a foreign government, or any
 state government that contains the photograph and signature of the
 acknowledging person.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *