Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB207 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Shapleigh S.B. No. 207
 (In the Senate - Filed November 10, 2008; February 11, 2009,
 read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 May 1, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 1, 2009, sent
 to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 207 By: Deuell


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to prohibition of certain business practices related to
 rescission of coverage under health benefit plans.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subtitle C, Title 6, Insurance Code, is amended
 by adding Chapter 848 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 848. PROHIBITED PRACTICES RELATED TO RESCISSION
 Sec. 848.001.  APPLICABILITY. (a)  This chapter applies to
 a health benefit plan that provides benefits in this state for
 medical or surgical expenses incurred as a result of a health
 condition, accident, or sickness, including an individual, group,
 blanket, or franchise insurance policy or insurance agreement, a
 group hospital service contract, or an individual or group evidence
 of coverage or similar coverage document that is offered by:
 (1) an insurance company;
 (2)  a group hospital service corporation operating
 under Chapter 842;
 (3)  a fraternal benefit society operating under
 Chapter 885;
 (4)  a stipulated premium company operating under
 Chapter 884;
 (5) a reciprocal exchange operating under Chapter 942;
 (6)  a health maintenance organization operating under
 Chapter 843;
 (7)  a multiple employer welfare arrangement that holds
 a certificate of authority under Chapter 846; or
 (8)  an approved nonprofit health corporation that
 holds a certificate of authority under Chapter 844.
 (b) This chapter does not apply to:
 (1) a health benefit plan that provides coverage only:
 (A)  for a specified disease or diseases or under
 an individual limited benefit policy;
 (B) for accidental death or dismemberment;
 (C)  as a supplement to a liability insurance
 policy; or
 (D) for dental or vision care;
 (2)  disability income insurance coverage or a
 combination of accident-only and disability income insurance
 coverage;
 (3) credit insurance coverage;
 (4) a hospital confinement indemnity policy;
 (5)  a Medicare supplemental policy as defined by
 Section 1882(g)(1), Social Security Act (42 U.S.C. Section 1395ss);
 (6) a workers' compensation insurance policy;
 (7)  medical payment insurance coverage provided under
 a motor vehicle insurance policy; or
 (8)  a long-term care insurance policy, including a
 nursing home fixed indemnity policy, unless the commissioner
 determines that the policy provides benefits so comprehensive that
 the policy is a health benefit plan and should not be subject to the
 exemption provided under this section.
 Sec. 848.002.  BAD FAITH RESCISSION. (a)  It is an unfair
 method of competition or an unfair or deceptive act or practice for
 purposes of Chapter 541 for a health benefit plan issuer to:
 (1) set rescission goals, quotas, or targets;
 (2)  pay compensation of any kind, including a bonus or
 award, that varies according to the number of rescissions;
 (3)  set, as a condition of employment, a number or
 volume of rescissions to be achieved; or
 (4)  set a performance standard, for employees or by
 contract with another entity, based on the number or volume of
 rescissions.
 (b)  For purposes of this chapter, "rescission" means the
 termination of an insurance agreement, contract, evidence of
 coverage, insurance policy, or other similar coverage document in
 which the health benefit plan issuer refunds premium payments or,
 if applicable, demands the restitution of any benefit paid under
 the plan, on the ground the issuer is entitled to restoration of the
 issuer's precontractual position.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *