Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2072 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Duncan S.B. No. 2072
 (In the Senate - Filed March 12, 2009; March 31, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 April 14, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 6,
 Nays 0; April 14, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to contracting with the secretary of state for the filing
 of personal financial statements by officers and employees of
 certain counties.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subsection (a), Section 159.034, Local
 Government Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (a) The commissioners court may require the report to be
 filed with the clerk of the commissioners court, the county
 auditor, or any other county officer. However, the commissioners
 court may require the report to be filed with the county clerk or
 other elected county officer only if the county clerk or elected
 county officer consents to the imposition of that duty. [The
 commissioners court may contract with the secretary of state for
 the filing of reports under this subchapter.]
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *