Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2075 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Hinojosa S.B. No. 2075
 (In the Senate - Filed March 12, 2009; March 31, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice;
 May 4, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 5, Nays 1; May 4, 2009, sent
 to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2075 By: Whitmire


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the consequences of successfully completing a term of
 deferred adjudication community supervision with respect to the
 expunction or use of certain criminal history records and files.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Article 55.01, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended by amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsection (e) to
 read as follows:
 (b) Except as provided by Subsection (c) [of this section],
 a district court may expunge all records and files relating to the
 arrest of a person who has been arrested for commission of a felony
 or misdemeanor under the procedure established under Article 55.02
 [of this code] if the person [is]:
 (1) is tried for the offense for which the person was
 arrested,[;
 [(2)] is convicted of the offense,[;] and
 [(3)] is acquitted by the court of criminal appeals;
 or
 (2)  is placed on deferred adjudication community
 supervision under Section 5, Article 42.12, for the offense for
 which the person was arrested and meets the requirements of
 Subsection (e).
 (e)  A person is eligible for an expunction under Subsection
 (b)(2) if the person:
 (1)  meets the requirements to be eligible for an order
 of nondisclosure under Section 411.081(d), Government Code, with
 respect to the offense for which the person was arrested and placed
 on deferred adjudication community supervision, regardless of
 whether, with respect to that offense, an order of nondisclosure
 was previously issued to the person or the person previously
 petitioned the court for an order of nondisclosure;
 (2)  with respect to the offense for which the person
 was arrested and placed on deferred adjudication community
 supervision, petitions the court for an order of expunction under
 Article 55.02 only on or after:
 (A)  the second anniversary of the discharge and
 dismissal, if the offense was a misdemeanor described by Section
 411.081(d)(1), Government Code;
 (B)  the fourth anniversary of the discharge and
 dismissal, if the offense was a misdemeanor described by Section
 411.081(d)(2), Government Code;
 (C)  the eighth anniversary of the discharge and
 dismissal, if the offense was a state jail felony; or
 (D)  the 10th anniversary of the discharge and
 dismissal, if the offense was a felony other than a state jail
 felony; and
 (3)  during the period of deferred adjudication
 community supervision for the offense and during the applicable
 period described by Subdivision (2), is not convicted of or placed
 on deferred adjudication community supervision for any offense
 other than an offense under the Transportation Code punishable by
 fine only.
 SECTION 2. Section 53.021, Occupations Code, is amended by
 adding Subsections (c), (d), and (e) to read as follows:
 (c)  Except as provided by Subsections (d) and (e),
 notwithstanding any other law, a licensing authority may not
 consider a person to have been convicted of an offense for purposes
 of this section if, regardless of the statutory authorization:
 (1)  the person entered a plea of guilty or nolo
 contendere;
 (2)  the judge deferred further proceedings without
 entering an adjudication of guilt and placed the person under the
 supervision of the court or an officer under the supervision of the
 court; and
 (3)  at the end of the period of supervision, the judge
 dismissed the proceedings and discharged the person.
 (d)  A licensing authority may consider a person to have been
 convicted of an offense for purposes of this section regardless of
 whether the proceedings were dismissed and the person was
 discharged as described by Subsection (c) if, after consideration
 of the factors described by Sections 53.022 and 53.023(a), the
 licensing authority determines that:
 (1)  the person may pose a continued threat to public
 safety; or
 (2)  employment of the person in the licensed
 occupation would create a situation in which the person has an
 opportunity to repeat the prohibited conduct.
 (e)  Subsection (c) does not apply if the person is an
 applicant for or the holder of a license that authorizes the person
 to provide law enforcement or public health, education, or safety
 services.
 SECTION 3. The change in law made by this Act to Article
 55.01, Code of Criminal Procedure, applies to a person who, on or
 after the effective date of this Act, seeks expunction of records
 and files relating to an arrest, regardless of whether the arrest
 occurred before, on, or after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *