Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2080 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    2009S0672-1 03/11/09
 By: Uresti S.B. No. 2080


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the establishment of a strategy for reducing child
 abuse and neglect and improving child welfare.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. In this Act, "task force" means the task force
 established under this Act to establish a strategy for reducing
 child abuse and neglect and improving child welfare.
 SECTION 2. (a) The task force consists of 15 members
 appointed as follows:
 (1) five members appointed by the governor;
 (2) five members appointed by the lieutenant governor;
 and
 (3) five members appointed by the speaker of the house
 of representatives.
 (b) Members of the task force must be individuals who are
 actively involved in the fields of the prevention of child abuse and
 neglect and child welfare. The appointment of members must reflect
 the geographic diversity of the state.
 (c) A member of the task force may not be appointed to, or be
 an employee of, a state agency.
 (d) A member of the task force is not entitled to
 compensation for service on the task force but is entitled to
 reimbursement for travel expenses as provided by Chapter 660,
 Government Code, and the General Appropriations Act.
 (e) The task force shall elect a presiding officer by a
 majority vote of the membership of the task force.
 (f) The task force shall meet at the call of the presiding
 officer.
 (g) Chapter 2110, Government Code, does not apply to the
 task force.
 SECTION 3. (a) The task force shall establish a strategy
 for reducing child abuse and neglect and for improving child
 welfare in this state. In establishing that strategy, the task
 force shall:
 (1) gather information concerning child safety, child
 abuse and neglect, and child welfare throughout the state;
 (2) review the exemptions from criminal liability
 provided under the Penal Code to a mother who injures her unborn
 child by using a controlled substance, as defined by Chapter 481,
 Health and Safety Code, other than a controlled substance legally
 obtained by prescription, during her pregnancy and examine the
 effect that repealing the exemptions will have on reducing the
 number of babies who are born addicted to a controlled substance;
 (3) receive reports and testimony from individuals,
 state and local agencies, community-based organizations, and other
 public and private organizations;
 (4) create goals for state policy that would improve
 child safety, prevent child abuse and neglect, and improve child
 welfare; and
 (5) submit a strategic plan to accomplish those goals.
 (b) The strategic plan submitted under Subsection (a) of
 this section may include proposals for specific statutory changes,
 the creation of new programs, and methods to foster cooperation
 among state agencies and between the state and local government.
 SECTION 4. (a) The task force shall consult with employees
 of the Department of Family and Protective Services, the Department
 of State Health Services, and the Texas Department of Criminal
 Justice as necessary to accomplish the task force's
 responsibilities under this Act.
 (b) The task force may cooperate as necessary with any other
 appropriate state agency.
 SECTION 5. (a) The governor, lieutenant governor, and
 speaker of the house of representatives shall appoint the members
 of the task force not later than October 1, 2009.
 (b) Not later than August 1, 2011, the task force shall
 submit the strategic plan required by Section 3 of this Act to the
 governor, lieutenant governor, and speaker of the house of
 representatives.
 (c) The task force is abolished and this Act expires on
 September 1, 2011.
 SECTION 6. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.