Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2085 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Davis S.B. No. 2085
 (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2009; March 31, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs; May 7, 2009,
 reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the
 following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 2; May 7, 2009, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2085 By: Lucio


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the offense of unlawful use of public funds for
 political advertising by a political subdivision.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 255.003, Election Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsections (d) and (e) to read
 as follows:
 (a) An officer or employee of a political subdivision may
 not knowingly spend or authorize the spending of public funds for
 political advertising.
 (d)  It is an affirmative defense to prosecution for an
 offense under this section or the imposition of a civil penalty for
 conduct under this section that an officer or employee of a
 political subdivision reasonably relied on a court order or an
 interpretation of this section in a written opinion issued by:
 (1) a court of record;
 (2) the attorney general; or
 (3) the commission.
 (e)  On written request of the governing body of a political
 subdivision that has ordered an election on a measure, the
 commission shall prepare an advance written advisory opinion as to
 whether a particular communication relating to the measure does or
 does not comply with this section.
 SECTION 2. Section 255.003, Election Code, as amended by
 this Act, applies to the prosecution of conduct committed before,
 on, or after September 1, 2009, as to which:
 (1) judgment has not been entered or a sentence has not
 been imposed; or
 (2) if judgment has been entered and a sentence
 imposed, an appeal is pending or the time for appeal has not
 expired.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *