Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2126 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Estes S.B. No. 2126
 (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2009; March 31, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources;
 April 20, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; April 20, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of owners and managers of apartment
 houses to assess a service charge for the submetering of water and
 wastewater services.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subsections (c) and (d), Section 13.503, Water
 Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (c) In addition to the charges permitted under Subsection
 (b), the rules shall authorize the owner or manager of a
 manufactured home rental community or apartment house [owner or
 manager] to impose a service charge of not more than nine percent of
 the costs related to submetering allocated to each submetered
 rental or dwelling unit.
 (d) For purposes of Subsection (c), "costs related to
 submetering" means water costs as well as any other applicable
 taxes and surcharges that are charged by the retail public utility
 to the owner or manager of a manufactured home rental community or
 apartment house [owner or manager].
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *