Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2136 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Eltife S.B. No. 2136
 (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2009; March 31, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Business and Commerce;
 May 5, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 5, 2009, sent
 to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2136 By: Eltife


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to provision of surplus lines insurance.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 981.004, Insurance Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsections (c), (d), (e), (f),
 (g), and (h) to read as follows:
 (a) An eligible surplus lines insurer may provide surplus
 lines insurance only if:
 (1) the full amount of required insurance cannot be
 obtained, after a diligent effort, from an insurer authorized to
 write and actually writing that kind and class of insurance in this
 state;
 (2) the insurance is placed through a surplus lines
 agent in accordance with this chapter; and
 (3) the insurer meets the eligibility requirements of
 Subchapter B as of the inception date and annual anniversary date of
 each insurance contract, cover note, or other confirmation of
 insurance.
 (c)  The commissioner may by order declare eligible for
 placement with a surplus lines insurer and exempt from the
 requirements of Subsections (a)(1) and (b) any kind of commercial
 insurance coverage or any commercial insurance risk for which the
 commissioner finds, after a public hearing, that there is an
 inadequate market among authorized insurers. In making a finding
 under this subsection, the commissioner has the discretion to
 determine what constitutes a "kind of commercial insurance
 coverage," a "commercial insurance risk," or an "inadequate market
 among authorized insurers" for the purposes of this subsection.
 (d)  The commissioner or the commissioner's designee shall
 maintain an export list showing the coverages and risks that are
 subject to a declaration under Subsection (c). The commissioner's
 determination under Subsection (c) that there is an inadequate
 market for a kind of commercial insurance coverage or a commercial
 insurance risk and the placement of the kind of commercial
 insurance coverage or commercial insurance risk on the export list
 continues in effect until the commissioner by order, after a public
 hearing, removes the kind of commercial insurance coverage or the
 commercial insurance risk from the list.
 (e)  A public hearing on the issuance of an order under this
 section shall be held only at the commissioner's discretion. Any
 interested party may petition the commissioner to consider the
 exercise of the commissioner's discretion to hold a hearing under
 this section. Reasonable notice of a hearing under this section
 shall be provided to all interested parties by publication in the
 Texas Register at least 30 days before the hearing. The notice must
 include the kind of commercial insurance coverage or the commercial
 insurance risk to be considered by the commissioner for inclusion
 on or removal from the export list. No kind of commercial insurance
 coverage or commercial insurance risk may be considered by the
 commissioner that is not specified in the published hearing notice.
 The notice may include a deadline by which interested parties are
 required to submit any written comments before the hearing. If the
 commissioner declines to hold a hearing in response to a petition
 under this subsection, the commissioner shall publish notice in the
 Texas Register of the commissioner's declination to hold the
 hearing not later than the 45th day after the date the commissioner
 receives the petition.
 (f)  As an alternative to a public hearing regarding the
 removal of a kind of commercial insurance coverage or a commercial
 insurance risk from the export list, the commissioner may, at the
 commissioner's discretion, issue an order removing the kind of
 coverage or the risk from the export list without a hearing. If the
 commissioner issues an order under this subsection, the order may
 not take effect before the 90th day after the date the order is
 issued.
 (g)  The commissioner or the commissioner's designee shall
 notify all interested parties of any removal of a line of insurance
 from the list by publication in the Texas Register not later than
 the 30th day after the date of the entry of the order.
 (h) The export list:
 (1)  is not designed to generate competition between
 the surplus lines market and the admitted market;
 (2) may only consist of commercial lines of insurance;
 (3)  is not intended to enable circumvention of state
 law, including the requirement that insurance procured through a
 surplus lines insurer may only be placed through a surplus lines
 agent; and
 (4)  is intended to express the commissioner's
 acknowledgment that the lines of insurance included on the export
 list may not be readily available in the admitted market.
 SECTION 2. Subsection (b), Section 981.101, Insurance Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (b) A surplus lines document must state, in 11-point type,
 the following:
 This insurance contract is with an insurer not licensed to transact
 insurance in this state and is issued and delivered as surplus line
 coverage under the Texas insurance statutes. The Texas Department
 of Insurance does not review or approve policy forms or rates used
 by the insurer providing this coverage, nor does it audit the
 finances or review the solvency of the surplus lines insurer
 providing this coverage, and the insurer is not a member of the
 property and casualty insurance guaranty association created under
 Chapter 462, Insurance Code. Chapter 225, Insurance Code, requires
 payment of a __________ (insert appropriate tax rate) percent tax
 on gross premium.
 SECTION 3. The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to surplus lines insurance coverage delivered, issued for delivery,
 or renewed on or after January 1, 2010. Surplus lines insurance
 coverage delivered, issued for delivery, or renewed before January
 1, 2010, is governed by the law in effect immediately before the
 effective date of this Act, and that law is continued in effect for
 that purpose.
 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *