Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2148 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Patrick S.B. No. 2148
 (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2009; March 31, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental
 Relations; April 24, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0;
 April 24, 2009, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2148 By: Patrick


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to information and assistance provided by the chief
 appraiser to emergency management authorities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter A, Chapter 6, Tax Code, is amended by
 adding Section 6.053 to read as follows:
 Sec. 6.053.  ASSISTANCE TO EMERGENCY MANAGEMENT
 AUTHORITIES.  The chief appraiser shall, if requested by the
 emergency management authorities of a federal, state, or local
 government agency, provide information and assistance pertinent to
 disaster mitigation or recovery, including assisting in the
 estimation of damage from an actual or potential disaster event.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *