Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2177 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Shapleigh S.B. No. 2177
 (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2009; March 31, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Administration;
 May 12, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 6,
 Nays 0; May 12, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the establishment of a nonprofit organization for the
 acquisition of historic art pieces for the Capitol.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Chapter 443, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Section 443.0104 to read as follows:
 Sec. 443.0104.  CAPITOL HISTORIC ART NONPROFIT
 ORGANIZATION. The board, in consultation with any appropriate
 state agencies and any appropriate committees that are established
 under this chapter, may participate in the establishment and
 operation of an affiliated nonprofit organization that is
 established for the purpose of raising money for the acquisition of
 art pieces for the Capitol.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *