Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2189 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Lucio S.B. No. 2189
 (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2009; March 31, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Higher Education;
 April 20, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0; April 20, 2009,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2189 By: Patrick


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the degrees awarded by the Texas State Technical
 College System.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 135.011, Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 135.011. DEFINITIONS. In this chapter [section]:
 (1) "Board" means the board of regents of the Texas
 State Technical College System.
 (2) "Coordinating board" means the Texas Higher
 Education Coordinating Board.
 (3) "System" means the Texas State Technical College
 System.
 (4) "Faculty research" means research using the
 system's facilities and equipment that is:
 (A) consistent with the system's mission; and
 (B) funded by private sources, competitively
 acquired sources, or appropriated public funding.
 (5) "Campus" means a residential unit of the system
 that grants associate degrees and certificates.
 (6) "Extension center" means a site, operating under
 the administration of a campus, that has an extension program.
 (7) "Extension program" includes credit and noncredit
 instruction in technical-vocational education.
 SECTION 2. Section 135.51, Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 135.51. CERTIFICATES, DIPLOMAS, AND ASSOCIATE
 DEGREES. (a) The board shall prescribe and award associate of
 applied science degrees, certificates, and diplomas limited to
 those appropriate to technical education.
 (b)  The board may offer and award an associate of science
 degree in a field of study at Texas State Technical
 College--Harlingen campus if the coordinating board determines
 that the degree in that field of study:
 (1)  is appropriate to the role and mission of the
 system; and
 (2)  meets the educational or workforce needs of the
 region in which the campus is located.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *