Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2195 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Williams S.B. No. 2195
 (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2009; March 31, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on International Relations and
 Trade; April 16, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 6, Nays 0; April 16, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the creation of and penalties for certain offenses that
 take place at or involve an attempt to cross an international
 border.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter D, Chapter 12, Penal Code, is amended
 by adding Section 12.50 to read as follows:
 Sec. 12.50.  PENALTIES FOR CERTAIN OFFENSES COMMITTED ON
 INTERNATIONAL BRIDGE. An offense under Section 31.07, 46.02, or
 46.05 is a felony of the second degree if the person who committed
 the offense was, at the time the offense was committed, traveling on
 an international bridge toward Mexico.
 SECTION 2. Section 38.05, Penal Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (c) and adding Subsection (e) to read as
 follows:
 (c) Except as provided by Subsections [Subsection] (d) and
 (e), an offense under this section is a Class A misdemeanor.
 (e)  An offense under this section is a felony of the second
 degree if the person who harbored or concealed another, provided
 another with a means of avoiding arrest or effecting an escape, or
 warned another of discovery or apprehension had the intent to
 transport the other person across an international boundary.
 SECTION 3. Chapter 46, Penal Code, is amended by adding
 Section 46.14 to read as follows:
 Sec. 46.14.  UNLAWFUL TRANSPORTATION OF CURRENCY. (a)  A
 person commits an offense if the person, with the intent to evade a
 currency reporting requirement under 31 U.S.C. Section 5316 while
 traveling on an international bridge toward Mexico, knowingly
 conceals more than $10,000 in currency or other monetary
 instruments on the person or in any conveyance, article of luggage,
 merchandise, or other container.
 (b)  An offense under this section is a felony of the second
 degree.
 SECTION 4. The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an offense committed on or after September 1, 2009. An offense
 committed before September 1, 2009, is governed by the law in effect
 when the offense was committed, and the former law is continued in
 effect for that purpose. For purposes of this section, an offense
 was committed before September 1, 2009, if any element of the
 offense occurred before that date.
 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *