By: Averitt S.B. No. 2231 (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2009; March 31, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on International Relations and Trade; April 24, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; April 24, 2009, sent to printer.) A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to the authority to establish, operate, and maintain a foreign trade zone and subzones in Ellis County. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 681.170, Business & Commerce Code, as effective April 1, 2009, is amended to read as follows: Sec. 681.170. CITY OF MIDLOTHIAN [TRADE ZONE CORPORATION]. The City of Midlothian [Trade Zone Corporation, organized under the laws of this state,] may apply for and accept a grant of authority to establish, operate, and maintain: (1) a foreign trade zone in Midlothian, Ellis County, adjacent to the port limits of the Dallas-Fort Worth port of entry; and (2) other subzones in Ellis County. SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009. * * * * *