Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2231 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Averitt S.B. No. 2231
 (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2009; March 31, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on International Relations and
 Trade; April 24, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 7, Nays 0; April 24, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authority to establish, operate, and maintain a
 foreign trade zone and subzones in Ellis County.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 681.170, Business & Commerce Code, as
 effective April 1, 2009, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 681.170. CITY OF MIDLOTHIAN [TRADE ZONE CORPORATION].
 The City of Midlothian [Trade Zone Corporation, organized under the
 laws of this state,] may apply for and accept a grant of authority
 to establish, operate, and maintain:
 (1) a foreign trade zone in Midlothian, Ellis County,
 adjacent to the port limits of the Dallas-Fort Worth port of entry;
 and
 (2) other subzones in Ellis County.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *