Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2235 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Seliger S.B. No. 2235
 (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2009; March 31, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources;
 May 4, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 3; May 4, 2009, sent
 to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2235 By: Seliger


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the names of persons included on a permit or license for
 certain solid waste facilities under the Solid Waste Disposal Act.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 361.003, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Subdivision (21-a) to read as follows:
 (21-a)  "Operator" means the holder of the permit or
 license who is responsible for the overall operation of a solid
 waste facility.
 SECTION 2. Sections 361.087 and 361.157, Health and Safety
 Code, are amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 361.087. CONTENTS OF PERMIT. A permit issued under
 this subchapter must include:
 (1) the name and address of each person who owns the
 land on which the solid waste facility is located and the person who
 is or will be the operator [or person in charge of the facility];
 (2) a legal description of the land on which the
 facility is located; and
 (3) the terms and conditions on which the permit is
 issued, including the duration of the permit.
 Sec. 361.157. CONTENTS OF LICENSE. A license for a solid
 waste facility issued by a county must include:
 (1) the name and address of each person who owns the
 land on which the solid waste facility is located and the person who
 is or will be the operator [or person in charge of the facility];
 (2) a legal description of the land on which the
 facility is located; and
 (3) the terms and conditions on which the license is
 issued, including the duration of the license.
 SECTION 3. The changes in law to Sections 361.003, 361.087,
 and 361.157, Health and Safety Code, as amended by this Act, do not
 affect the status as of the effective date of this Act of any permit
 or license for, holder of a permit or license for, or owner or
 operator of a solid waste facility under Chapter 361, Health and
 Safety Code. The Texas Commission on Environmental Quality shall
 amend the commission's rules as necessary for the commission's
 permitting actions taken after the effective date of this Act to
 conform to those sections, as amended.
 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *