Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2242 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 2242
 (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2009; March 31, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 April 22, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; April 22, 2009,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2242 By: Van de Putte


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the provision of assistance by the Texas Ethics
 Commission in the reporting of political contributions and
 expenditures made in connection with offices of and measures
 proposed by local governmental entities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Chapter 571, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subchapter G to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER G.  REPORTING OF POLITICAL CONTRIBUTIONS AND
 EXPENDITURES RELATED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENTAL ENTITIES AND OFFICERS
 Sec. 571.201.  PURPOSE.  The purpose of this subchapter is to
 further the objective of fully disclosing information related to
 political contributions and expenditures made in connection with
 offices of and measures proposed by local governmental entities by
 allowing a local governmental entity or a candidate for or holder of
 an office of a local governmental entity or a related
 specific-purpose committee to use the commission's software and
 other commission resources to file reports of political
 contributions and expenditures required by Title 15, Election Code.
 Sec. 571.202. DEFINITIONS. In this subchapter:
 (1)  "Local governmental entity" and "local government
 officer" have the meanings assigned by Section 176.001, Local
 Government Code.
 (2)  "Measure," "political contribution," "political
 expenditure," and "specific-purpose committee" have the meanings
 assigned by Section 251.001, Election Code.
 Sec. 571.203.  USE OF COMMISSION SOFTWARE AND RESOURCES.
 (a)  To fulfill the purpose of this subchapter and to facilitate
 filing of reports of political contributions and expenditures
 required by Title 15, Election Code, the commission may allow the
 use of commission software and resources by:
 (1) a local governmental entity;
 (2) a local government officer;
 (3)  a candidate for an office of a local governmental
 entity; or
 (4)  a specific-purpose committee for supporting or
 opposing a candidate for an office of a local governmental entity,
 assisting a local government officer, or supporting or opposing a
 measure proposed by a local governmental entity.
 (b)  The commission may provide assistance to a local
 governmental entity, a local government officer, a candidate for an
 office of a local governmental entity, or a specific-purpose
 committee by:
 (1)  developing software to facilitate electronic
 filing of reports of political contributions and expenditures;
 (2)  maintaining reports of political contributions
 and expenditures for electronic publishing and filing; and
 (3)  providing public access through the commission's
 Internet website to electronic reports of political contributions
 and expenditures filed by:
 (A) a local governmental entity;
 (B) a local government officer;
 (C)  a candidate for an office of a local
 governmental entity; or
 (D)  a specific-purpose committee for supporting
 or opposing a candidate for an office of a local governmental
 entity, assisting a local government officer, or supporting or
 opposing a measure proposed by a local governmental entity.
 (c)  The commission may enter into an intergovernmental
 contract with a local governmental entity to provide the assistance
 described by Subsection (b).
 SECTION 2. This Act does not make an appropriation. A
 provision in this Act that creates a new governmental program,
 creates a new entitlement, or imposes a new duty on a governmental
 entity is not mandatory during a fiscal period for which the
 legislature has not made a specific appropriation to implement the
 provision.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *