Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2266 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Gallegos S.B. No. 2266
 (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2009; March 31, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources;
 April 22, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 8,
 Nays 0; April 22, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to standards for installing fire hydrants in certain
 residential areas.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subsection (b), Section 341.0357, Health and
 Safety Code, as added by Chapter 861 (H.B. 1391), Acts of the 80th
 Legislature, Regular Session, 2007, is amended to read as follows:
 (b) The regulatory authority for a public utility shall by
 rule or ordinance adopt standards for installing fire hydrants and
 maintaining sufficient water pressure for service to fire hydrants
 adequate to protect public safety in residential areas in a
 municipality with a population of 1,000,000 or more.
 SECTION 2. Subsection (b), Section 341.0358, Health and
 Safety Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (b) The regulatory authority for a public utility shall by
 rule or ordinance adopt standards for installing fire hydrants and
 maintaining sufficient water pressure for service to fire hydrants
 adequate to protect public safety in residential areas in a
 municipality with a population of 1,000,000 or more.
 SECTION 3. (a) Section 1 of this Act takes effect only if
 the Act of the 81st Legislature, Regular Session, 2009, relating to
 nonsubstantive additions to and corrections in existing codes
 (H.B. No. 3545 or S.B. No. 1969) does not become law. If the Act of
 the 81st Legislature, Regular Session, 2009, relating to
 nonsubstantive additions to and corrections in existing codes
 (H.B. No. 3545 or S.B. No. 1969) becomes law, Section 1 of this Act
 has no effect.
 (b) Section 2 of this Act takes effect only if the Act of the
 81st Legislature, Regular Session, 2009, relating to
 nonsubstantive additions to and corrections in existing codes
 (H.B. No. 3545 or S.B. No. 1969) becomes law. If the Act of the
 81st Legislature, Regular Session, 2009, relating to
 nonsubstantive additions to and corrections in existing codes
 (H.B. No. 3545 or S.B. No. 1969) does not become law, Section 2 of
 this Act has no effect.
 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *