By: Gallegos S.B. No. 2267 (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2009; March 31, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on Higher Education; April 29, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 3, Nays 1; April 29, 2009, sent to printer.) A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to eligibility for an award through the Early High School Graduation Scholarship program. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 56.203, Education Code, is amended by amending Subsections (a) and (e) and adding Subsection (f) to read as follows: (a) To be eligible for an award through the Early High School Graduation Scholarship program, a person must: (1) have graduated from a public high school in this state: (A) in not more than 41 consecutive months and successfully completed the recommended or advanced high school program established under Section 28.025, if the person graduated on or after September 1, 2005; (B) in not more than 46 consecutive months, with at least 30 hours of college credit, and successfully completed the recommended or advanced high school program established under Section 28.025, if the person graduated on or after September 1, 2005; or (C) in not more than 36 consecutive months after successfully completing the requirements for a high school diploma, if the person graduated before September 1, 2005, regardless of whether the person successfully completed the recommended or advanced high school program established under Section 28.025; (2) have attended one or more public high schools in this state for the majority of time the person attended high school, except as provided by Subsection (f); and (3) except as provided by Subsection (f), be a citizen of the United States or otherwise lawfully authorized to be present in the United States. (e) The coordinating board shall adopt rules for determining whether a person attended public high school in this state as required by Subsection (a)(2) and for determining under Subsection (f)(2) whether a person attended a high school other than a public high school in this state primarily because of the migratory agricultural or fishing work of the person, the person's parent, or the person's spouse. The coordinating board may adopt other rules the board considers necessary for the administration of Subsection (f). (f) A person described by Subsection (a)(1)(A) or (B) who is otherwise eligible for an award and who is a migratory child, as defined by 20 U.S.C. Section 6399, is eligible for an award through the Early High School Graduation Scholarship program despite the student's inability to satisfy Subsection (a)(2) or (3) if: (1) the person graduates from a public high school in this state; and (2) the person attended one or more high schools, other than a public high school in this state, for one or more periods primarily because of the migratory agricultural or fishing work of the person, the person's parent, or the person's spouse, and the person would have satisfied Subsection (a)(2) if the person had attended a public high school in this state during that period or those periods. SECTION 2. The changes in law made by this Act apply only to a student who graduates from a public high school in this state on or after the effective date of this Act. A student who graduates from a public high school in this state before the effective date of this Act and the student's eligibility to participate in the Early High School Graduation Scholarship program is governed by the law in effect immediately before the effective date of this Act, and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose. SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2009. * * * * *