Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2285 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Lucio S.B. No. 2285
 (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2009; March 31, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on International Relations and
 Trade; April 16, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 6, Nays 0; April 16, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to financial assistance by the Texas Water Development
 Board for the connection of residences in economically distressed
 areas to public water supply and sanitary sewer systems.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter K, Chapter 17, Water Code, is amended
 by adding Section 17.9225 to read as follows:
 Sec. 17.9225.  RESIDENTIAL WATER AND SEWER CONNECTION
 ASSISTANCE. (a)  The legislature finds that, due to public health
 and sanitation concerns, it is in the public interest to use funds
 in the economically distressed areas account to provide financial
 assistance for the costs associated with the initial connection to
 public water supply and sanitary sewer systems of residences that
 otherwise benefit from financial assistance.
 (b)  A political subdivision may use financial assistance to
 pay:
 (1)  the costs of connecting a residence to a public
 water supply system constructed with financial assistance;
 (2)  the costs of installing yard water service
 connections;
 (3)  the costs of installing indoor plumbing facilities
 and fixtures;
 (4)  the costs of connecting a residence to a sanitary
 sewer system constructed with financial assistance;
 (5) necessary connection and permit fees; and
 (6)  necessary costs related to the design of plumbing
 improvements described by this subsection.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *