Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB229 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: West S.B. No. 229
 (In the Senate - Filed November 10, 2008; February 11, 2009,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental
 Relations; March 9, 2009, reported favorably by the following
 vote: Yeas 3, Nays 0; March 9, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the procurement methods authorized for public projects
 by certain local governments.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 271.182, Local Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 271.182. APPLICABILITY. This [(a)     Before September
 1, 2009, this subchapter applies to a local governmental entity
 with a population of 500,000 or more within its geographic
 boundaries or service area.
 [(b)     On or after September 1, 2009, and before September 1,
 2011, this] subchapter applies to a local governmental entity with
 a population of more than 100,000 within its geographic boundaries
 or service area.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *