Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2292 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    81R6837 EAH-D
 By: Lucio S.B. No. 2292


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the establishment of a natural disaster housing
 reconstruction initiative.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. The purpose of this Act is to encourage the
 development of a model reconstruction plan for future
 reconstruction efforts to increase the effective and efficient
 delivery of natural disaster recovery services by state agencies.
 This Act is not meant to affect ongoing reconstruction efforts.
 SECTION 2. Chapter 418, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subchapter J to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER J. NATURAL DISASTER HOUSING RECONSTRUCTION INITIATIVE
 Sec. 418.301.  NATURAL DISASTER HOUSING RECONSTRUCTION
 ADVISORY COMMITTEE. (a) The natural disaster housing
 reconstruction advisory committee is composed of:
 (1)  the executive director of the Texas Department of
 Housing and Community Affairs;
 (2)  the executive director of the Office of Rural
 Community Affairs;
 (3) the director of the division; and
 (4)  one representative of each of the following
 appointed by the natural disaster housing reconstruction
 coordinator:
 (A)  the College of Engineering of Texas Tech
 University;
 (B)  the community and regional planning program
 of The University of Texas at Austin;
 (C)  the School of Architecture of Rice
 University;
 (D)  the School of Social Work of The University
 of Texas at Austin;
 (E) the Texas Society of Architects;
 (F)  the Austin Community Design and Development
 Center;
 (G)  the Texas Low Income Housing Information
 Service;
 (H) the Texas Association of Builders;
 (I) the Texas Manufactured Housing Association;
 (J) Gulf Coast Interfaith;
 (K)  the United States Department of Homeland
 Security;
 (L) the Federal Emergency Management Agency;
 (M)  the United States Department of Housing and
 Urban Development;
 (N)  the Community Development Corporation of
 Brownsville;
 (O)  community development corporations from two
 other communities affected by hurricanes; and
 (P) Habitat for Humanity.
 (b)  The advisory committee shall develop a natural disaster
 reconstruction plan. In developing this plan, the advisory
 committee shall:
 (1)  evaluate existing systems of providing temporary
 housing to victims of natural disasters and develop alternative
 systems to increase efficiency and cost-effectiveness;
 (2)  evaluate existing models for providing permanent
 replacement housing to victims of natural disasters;
 (3)  design alternatives to existing models to improve
 the sustainability, affordability, desirability, and quality of
 housing rebuilt in the event of future natural disasters;
 (4)  evaluate economic circumstances of elderly,
 disabled, and low-income victims of natural disasters and develop
 models for providing affordable replacement housing;
 (5)  recommend programs for the rapid and efficient
 large-scale production of temporary and permanent replacement
 housing following a natural disaster; and
 (6)  encourage the participation, coordination, and
 involvement of appropriate federal organizations.
 (c)  The Texas Department of Housing and Community Affairs
 shall provide funding for the advisory committee through the
 department's research funds.
 (d) Chapter 2110 does not apply to the advisory committee.
 Sec. 418.302.  NATURAL DISASTER HOUSING RECONSTRUCTION
 COORDINATOR. (a) The governor shall appoint an employee of the
 office of the governor or the administrative head of a state agency
 as the natural disaster housing reconstruction coordinator. The
 coordinator serves at the pleasure of the governor.
 (b) The coordinator shall:
 (1)  call meetings of the advisory committee as
 necessary;
 (2)  assist the advisory committee in developing and
 implementing the natural disaster reconstruction plan;
 (3)  submit the natural disaster reconstruction plan to
 the governor, lieutenant governor, speaker of the house of
 representatives, and members of the legislature;
 (4)  work with appropriate state agencies to address
 any housing-related issues, including liens, identified by the
 advisory committee that may assist state agencies in efforts to
 reconstruct homes following disasters; and
 (5)  encourage the participation, coordination, and
 involvement of appropriate federal organizations.
 (c)  The agency that employs the coordinator shall provide
 funding for the coordinator position using money from any source
 that may be used to respond to a natural disaster.
 Sec. 418.303.  HOUSING RECONSTRUCTION DEMONSTRATION
 PROGRAM. (a) Using the natural disaster reconstruction plan
 developed under this subchapter, the coordinator and advisory
 committee shall develop and implement a housing reconstruction
 demonstration program in three areas previously affected by a
 natural disaster. The program must provide for the replacement of
 at least 20 houses in each area to test the feasibility of
 implementing the plan in the production of replacement housing for
 victims of natural disasters.
 (b)  The program shall be implemented using available funds
 from the housing trust fund or any other federal or state funds
 available.
 Sec. 418.304.  ASSISTANCE AND STAFFING. The division, with
 the assistance of the Texas Department of Housing and Community
 Affairs and the Office of Rural Community Affairs, shall assist the
 coordinator and advisory committee as necessary, including by
 providing appropriate staff.
 SECTION 3. (a) Not later than October 1, 2009, the governor
 shall appoint the natural disaster housing reconstruction
 coordinator under Section 418.302, Government Code, as added by
 this Act.
 (b) The natural disaster housing reconstruction coordinator
 shall, not later than 14 days after appointment, call an initial
 meeting of the advisory committee under Section 418.301, Government
 Code, as added by this Act.
 (c) Not later than 60 days after appointment of the
 coordinator, the advisory committee shall develop a preliminary
 natural disaster reconstruction plan under Section 418.301(b),
 Government Code, as added by this Act.
 (d) Not later than December 1, 2009, the advisory committee
 shall submit the final natural disaster reconstruction plan.
 (e) Not later than February 1, 2010, the advisory committee
 shall implement the housing reconstruction demonstration program
 established under Section 418.303, Government Code, as added by
 this Act.
 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.