Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2292 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Lucio S.B. No. 2292
 (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2009; March 31, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on International Relations and
 Trade; April 14, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0;
 April 14, 2009, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2292 By: Lucio


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the establishment of a natural disaster housing
 reconstruction initiative.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. The purpose of this Act is to encourage the
 development of a model plan for future reconstruction efforts to
 increase the effective and efficient delivery of natural disaster
 housing recovery services by state agencies. This Act is not meant
 to delay or otherwise interfere with ongoing reconstruction
 efforts.
 SECTION 2. Chapter 2306, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subchapter X-2 to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER X-2.  NATURAL DISASTER HOUSING RECONSTRUCTION
 INITIATIVE
 Sec. 2306.541.  NATURAL DISASTER HOUSING RECONSTRUCTION
 ADVISORY COMMITTEE.  (a)  The director shall appoint a natural
 disaster housing reconstruction advisory committee composed of
 representatives from appropriate local, state, and federal
 entities and organizations and nonprofit organizations.
 (b)  The advisory committee shall develop a natural disaster
 housing reconstruction plan.  In developing this plan, the advisory
 committee shall:
 (1)  evaluate existing systems of providing temporary
 housing to victims of natural disasters and develop alternative
 systems to increase efficiency and cost-effectiveness;
 (2)  evaluate existing models for providing permanent
 replacement housing to victims of natural disasters;
 (3)  design alternatives to existing models to improve
 the sustainability, affordability, desirability, and quality of
 housing rebuilt in the event of future natural disasters;
 (4)  evaluate economic circumstances of elderly,
 disabled, and low-income victims of natural disasters and develop
 models for providing affordable replacement housing;
 (5)  recommend programs for the rapid and efficient
 large-scale production of temporary and permanent replacement
 housing following a natural disaster; and
 (6)  encourage the participation, coordination, and
 involvement of appropriate federal organizations.
 (c) Chapter 2110 does not apply to the advisory committee.
 Sec. 2306.542.  HOUSING RECONSTRUCTION DEMONSTRATION PILOT
 PROGRAM.  (a)  Using the natural disaster housing reconstruction
 plan developed under this subchapter, the director and advisory
 committee shall develop, for implementation under Subsections (b)
 and (c), housing reconstruction demonstration pilot programs for
 three areas, each of which was affected by one of the three most
 recent federally declared natural disasters.  The pilot programs
 must provide for the replacement of at least 20 houses in each area
 to test the feasibility of implementing the plan in the large-scale
 production of replacement housing for victims of federally declared
 natural disasters.
 (b)  The department shall provide to an interested council of
 government, county, or local government eligible for funding for
 disaster recovery under the community development block grant
 program:
 (1)  information regarding a pilot program developed
 under Subsection (a); and
 (2)  assistance in implementing a pilot program
 developed under Subsection (a).
 (c)  At the discretion of the board, the department may
 implement a pilot program in any of the three most recently
 federally declared disaster areas in which a pilot program has not
 been implemented by a council of government, county, or local
 government.  The department may use any available funds to
 implement the pilot program.
 SECTION 3. (a) Not later than January 1, 2010, the
 executive director of the Texas Department of Housing and Community
 Affairs shall submit the natural disaster housing reconstruction
 plan developed under Subsection (b), Section 2306.541, Government
 Code, as added by this Act, to the governing board of the Texas
 Department of Housing and Community Affairs.
 (b) Not later than March 1, 2010, the executive director of
 the Texas Department of Housing and Community Affairs shall provide
 housing reconstruction demonstration pilot program information to
 an interested council of government, county, or local government
 eligible for funding for disaster recovery under the community
 development block grant program.
 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *