Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2296 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Duncan S.B. No. 2296
 (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2009; March 31, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources;
 April 17, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 17, 2009,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2296 By: Duncan


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the submission of groundwater management plans to the
 executive administrator of the Texas Water Development Board.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 36.1072, Water Code, is amended by
 amending Subsections (a) and (e) and adding Subsection (e-1) to
 read as follows:
 (a) Except as provided by Subsection (e-1), a [A] district
 shall, not later than three years after the creation of the district
 or, if the district required confirmation, after the election
 confirming the district's creation, submit the management plan
 required under Section 36.1071 to the executive administrator for
 review and approval.
 (e) The district may review the plan annually and must
 review and readopt the plan with or without revisions at least once
 every five years. Except as provided by Subsection (e-1),
 the [The] district shall provide the readopted plan to the
 executive administrator not later than the 60th day after the date
 on which the plan was readopted. Approval of the preceding
 management plan remains in effect until:
 (1) the district fails to timely readopt a management
 plan;
 (2) the district fails to timely submit the district's
 readopted management plan to the executive administrator; or
 (3) the executive administrator determines that the
 readopted management plan does not meet the requirements for
 approval, and the district has exhausted all appeals to the Texas
 Water Development Board or appropriate court.
 (e-1)  If a district is required to submit a management plan
 under Subsection (a) or a readopted management plan under
 Subsection (e) prior to a date that is one year after the date the
 executive administrator provides to the district under Section
 36.108(o) the amount of managed available groundwater, the district
 may in its sole discretion submit to the executive administrator a
 new or readopted plan not later than the first anniversary of the
 date the district receives the amount of managed available
 groundwater from the executive administrator in lieu of the
 applicable deadlines set forth under Subsection (a) or (e).  A
 district to which this subsection applies may not adopt new or
 amended rules limiting production of wells or allocating
 groundwater before the district submits to the executive
 administrator the management plan or readopted plan as provided by
 this subsection.  This subsection expires September 1, 2013.
 SECTION 2. Section 36.1072, Water Code, as amended by this
 Act, applies only to a groundwater management plan that is
 submitted to the executive administrator of the Texas Water
 Development Board on or after the effective date of this Act. A
 groundwater management plan that is submitted to the executive
 administrator before the effective date of this Act is governed by
 the law in effect when the management plan was submitted, and the
 former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *