Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2298 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Watson S.B. No. 2298
 (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2009; March 31, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Government Organization;
 April 23, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0; April 23, 2009,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2298 By: Nelson


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to compensation of certain state employees.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subsection (i), Section 659.016, Government
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (i) Except as provided by this subsection, an [An] employee
 covered by this section may not be paid for any unused compensatory
 time. With authorization from the administrative head of the
 agency for which the employee works or that person's designee, an
 employee may be paid for the hours of compensatory time the employee
 earns for work directly related to a disaster or emergency declared
 by the appropriate officer of the state or federal government.
 SECTION 2. Section 659.018, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 659.018. COMPENSATORY TIME: PLACE WHERE WORK
 PERFORMED. (a) Except under circumstances specified in the
 General Appropriations Act or as provided by Subsection (b), an
 employee of a state agency as defined by Section 658.001 may not,
 for hours worked during any calendar week, accumulate compensatory
 time off under Section 659.015(f) or 659.016 to the extent that the
 hours are attributable to work performed at a location other than
 the employee's regular or temporarily assigned place of employment.
 (b)  An employee may accumulate compensatory time off for
 hours worked during any calendar week at the [The] employee's
 personal residence if the employee obtains the advance approval of
 the administrative head of the agency for which the employee works
 or that person's designee [may not be considered the employee's
 regular or temporarily assigned place of employment].
 SECTION 3. Section 659.255, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (g) to read as follows:
 (g)  The six-month limitations prescribed by Subsections
 (f)(2) and (5) do not apply if the administrative head of the agency
 determines in writing that the merit payment is made in relation to
 the employee's performance during a natural disaster or other
 extraordinary circumstance.
 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *