Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2308 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Gallegos S.B. No. 2308
 (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2009; March 31, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Education; April 15, 2009,
 reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the
 following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; April 15, 2009, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2308 By: Gallegos


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the use of discretionary funds raised by public school
 campuses.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter Z, Chapter 44, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 44.908 to read as follows:
 Sec. 44.908.  USE OF CAMPUS DISCRETIONARY FUNDS. (a)  In
 this section, "campus discretionary funds" means money raised at a
 public school campus through vending machines or other sources
 specifically associated with the campus.
 (b) Campus discretionary funds may be used only to:
 (1)  directly benefit the general welfare and
 educational development and morale of students enrolled at the
 campus; or
 (2)  provide professional development for campus
 educators, including teachers, administrators, counselors, and
 librarians, that:
 (A) deepens and broadens knowledge of content;
 (B)  provides a strong foundation in the pedagogy
 of particular disciplines;
 (C)  provides knowledge about the teaching and
 learning processes;
 (D)  is based on and reflects the best available
 research;
 (E)  is aligned with the standards and curriculum
 used in the school district;
 (F)  contributes to measurable improvement in
 student achievement;
 (G)  deepens and broadens knowledge and
 understanding of strategies needed to promote college and career
 readiness; and
 (H)  provides opportunities to build proficiency
 in data-driven decision-making.
 (c)  Subject to Subsection (b), the board of trustees of the
 district has authority over the specific use of campus
 discretionary funds.
 SECTION 2. Section 44.908, Education Code, as added by this
 Act, applies to any expenditure of campus discretionary funds that
 occurs on or after the effective date of this Act, regardless of the
 date on which the funds were raised.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *