Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2315 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Averitt S.B. No. 2315
 (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2009; March 31, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources;
 April 15, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; April 15, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to water audits by retail public utilities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 16.0121, Water Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsection (g) to read as
 follows:
 (b) Except as provided by Subsection (g) [Every five years],
 a retail public utility providing potable water shall perform and
 file with the board, every five years, a water audit computing the
 utility's most recent annual system water loss.
 (g)  A retail public utility shall perform and file with the
 board a water loss audit annually if the utility is receiving any
 financial assistance from the board.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *