Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2318 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Averitt S.B. No. 2318
 (In the Senate - Filed March 18, 2009; March 31, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources;
 April 15, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; April 15, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the use and management of surface water resources.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 11.002, Water Code, is amended by
 amending Subdivision (1) and adding Subdivision (7) to read as
 follows:
 (1) "Commission" means the Texas [Natural Resource
 Conservation] Commission on Environmental Quality.
 (7) "Developed water" means:
 (A)  groundwater that is in a watercourse or
 stream, that would not be in the watercourse or stream but for the
 efforts of the developer, and that is intended for subsequent
 diversion and use by the developer;
 (B)  surface water obtained through an approved
 interbasin transfer of water that is in a watercourse or stream,
 that would not be in the watercourse or stream but for the efforts
 of the developer, and that is intended for subsequent diversion and
 use by the developer;
 (C) waters imported from another state; and
 (D)  waters originating in the bays or arms of the
 Gulf of Mexico.
 SECTION 2. Subsection (e), Section 11.023, Water Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (e) The amount of water appropriated for each purpose
 mentioned in this section shall be specifically appropriated,
 stored, or diverted for that purpose, subject to the preferences
 prescribed in Section 11.024 of this code. The commission may
 authorize appropriation of a single amount or volume of water for
 more than one purpose of use. In the event that a single amount or
 volume of water is appropriated for more than one purpose of use,
 the total amount of water actually diverted for all of the
 authorized purposes may not exceed the total amount of water
 appropriated.
 SECTION 3. Subsection (b), Section 11.042, Water Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (b) A person who wishes to discharge and then subsequently
 divert and reuse the person's existing return flows derived from
 developed water [privately owned groundwater] must obtain prior
 authorization from the commission for the diversion and the reuse
 of these return flows. The authorization may allow for the
 diversion and reuse by the discharger of existing return flows,
 less carriage losses, and shall be subject to special conditions if
 necessary to protect an existing water right that was granted based
 on the use or availability of these return flows. Special
 conditions may also be provided to help maintain instream uses and
 freshwater inflows to bays and estuaries. A person wishing to
 divert and reuse future increases of return flows derived from
 developed water [privately owned groundwater] must obtain
 authorization to reuse increases in return flows before the
 increase.
 SECTION 4. Subsection (c), Section 11.126, Water Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (c) If the application proposes construction of a dam
 greater than six feet in height measured from the channel invert
 elevation to the top of the dam either for diversion or storage, the
 executive director may also require filing a copy of all plans and
 specifications and a copy of the engineer's field notes of any
 survey of the lake or reservoir. No work on the project shall
 proceed until approval of the plans is obtained from the executive
 director.
 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *