Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2325 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Hinojosa S.B. No. 2325
 (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2009; March 31, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Jurisprudence;
 April 14, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 7,
 Nays 0; April 14, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the confidentiality of certain information pertaining
 to the State Commission on Judicial Conduct.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 33.032, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (i) to read as follows:
 (i)  The discussions, thought processes, or individual votes
 of members of the commission, the discussions or thought processes
 of employees of the commission, including special counsel for the
 commission, and the identity of a confidential complainant or
 informant are confidential and privileged unless expressly waived,
 in writing, by the commission or, in the case of a confidential
 complainant or informant, by that individual or the legal
 representative of the individual.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *