Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2333 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Lucio S.B. No. 2333
 (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2009; March 31, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture and Rural
 Affairs; May 4, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 4, 2009, sent
 to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2333 By: Estes


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the marketing of shrimp and aquaculture products.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subdivision (5), Section 47.051, Agriculture
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (5) "Texas-produced shrimp" means wild-caught shrimp
 commercially harvested from coastal waters by a shrimp boat
 licensed by the Parks and Wildlife Department [and produced within
 the borders of the state].
 SECTION 2. Subsection (a), Section 47.052, Agriculture
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (a) The Texas shrimp marketing assistance program is
 established in the department to assist the Texas wild-caught
 shrimping [shrimp] industry in promoting and marketing
 Texas-produced shrimp and educating the public about the Texas
 wild-caught shrimping [shrimp] industry and Texas-produced shrimp.
 SECTION 3. Subsection (b), Section 47.053, Agriculture
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (b) The advisory committee shall be composed of the
 following nine [10] members:
 (1) two owners of commercial bay shrimp boats;
 (2) two owners of commercial gulf shrimp boats;
 (3) [one member of the Texas shrimp aquaculture
 industry;
 [(4)] one retail wild-caught shrimp [fish] dealer;
 (4) [(5)] one wholesale wild-caught shrimp [fish]
 dealer;
 (5) [(6)] one person employed by an institution of
 higher education as a researcher or instructor specializing in the
 area of food science, particularly seafood;
 (6) [(7)] one member of the seafood restaurant
 industry; and
 (7) [(8)] one representative of the public.
 SECTION 4. Subsection (b), Section 47.054, Agriculture
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (b) Unless otherwise expressly provided by the legislature,
 the source of funding for the payment of employee salaries shall be
 funds generated from the program, including the 10 percent license
 fee increase authorized by Section 77.002, Parks and Wildlife
 Code[, and the surcharge on license fees authorized by Section
 134.014].
 SECTION 5. Section 47.055, Agriculture Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 47.055. PROMOTION, MARKETING, AND EDUCATION. The
 program shall promote and advertise the Texas wild-caught shrimping
 [shrimp] industry by:
 (1) developing and maintaining a database of Texas
 shrimp wholesalers that sell Texas-produced shrimp;
 (2) operating a toll-free telephone number to:
 (A) receive inquiries from persons who wish to
 purchase a particular type of Texas-produced shrimp; and
 (B) make information about the Texas wild-caught
 shrimping [shrimp] industry available to the public;
 (3) developing a wild-caught shrimping [shrimp]
 industry marketing plan to increase the consumption of
 Texas-produced shrimp;
 (4) educating the public about Texas-produced shrimp
 by providing publicity about the information in the program's
 database to the public and making the information available to the
 public through the department's toll-free telephone number and
 electronically through the Internet;
 (5) promoting the Texas wild-caught shrimping
 [shrimp] industry; and
 (6) promoting and marketing, and educating consumers
 about, Texas-produced shrimp using any other method the
 commissioner determines appropriate.
 SECTION 6. Section 134.014, Agriculture Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 134.014. LICENSE FEES. [(a)] The department shall
 issue an aquaculture license or a fish farm vehicle license on
 completion of applicable license requirements and the payment of a
 fee by the applicant, as provided by department rule.
 [(b)     In addition to the fees under Subsection (a), the
 department shall assess and collect a surcharge on the annual
 license fee for aquaculture facilities producing shrimp for the
 purpose of funding the Texas shrimp marketing assistance program
 created under Subchapter B, Chapter 47. The amount of the surcharge
 shall be set each year, as provided by department rule, in an amount
 equal to 10 percent of the fees generated by the Parks and Wildlife
 Department under Section 77.002(c), Parks and Wildlife Code.
 [(c)     The department shall deposit at the end of each
 quarter, to the credit of the shrimp marketing account, the fees
 received under Subsection (b) for use by the department to conduct
 and operate the Texas shrimp marketing assistance program created
 under Subchapter B, Chapter 47.]
 SECTION 7. Subsection (b), Section 77.002, Parks and
 Wildlife Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (b) The shrimp marketing account is an account in the
 general revenue fund to be used by the Department of Agriculture
 solely for the purpose of the Texas shrimp marketing assistance
 program established under Subchapter B, Chapter 47, Agriculture
 Code. The account consists of funds deposited to the account under
 this section [and Section 134.014(b), Agriculture Code]. The
 account is exempt from the application of Section 11.032 of this
 code and Section 403.095, Government Code.
 SECTION 8. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *