Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2341 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Averitt S.B. No. 2341
 (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2009; March 31, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Business and Commerce;
 April 16, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0; April 16, 2009,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2341 By: Averitt


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to authorizing individuals to leave certain permitted
 premises and other areas with alcoholic beverages.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Chapter 28, Alcoholic Beverage Code, is amended
 by adding Section 28.101 to read as follows:
 Sec. 28.101.  PUBLIC CONSUMPTION. (a)  This section applies
 only to a mixed beverage permit holder whose premises are located in
 a municipality that:
 (1) has a population of less than 15,000;
 (2)  is located in a county with a population of less
 than 65,000; and
 (3)  contains a historic preservation district that
 borders a lake.
 (b)  Notwithstanding Section 28.10 or any other law, the
 holder of a mixed beverage permit whose permitted premises are
 located on property owned by a municipality that contains a
 municipally owned conference center and that borders a lake may
 permit a patron to leave the permitted premises, even though the
 patron possesses an alcoholic beverage, if:
 (1)  the beverage is in an open container and appears to
 be possessed for present consumption; and
 (2)  the public consumption of alcoholic beverages or
 possession of an open container of an alcoholic beverage is not
 prohibited on the municipally owned property where the permitted
 premises are located.
 (c)  This section does not affect the prohibition against
 possessing an open container in a passenger area of a motor vehicle
 under Section 49.031, Penal Code.
 SECTION 2. Chapter 31, Alcoholic Beverage Code, is amended
 by adding Section 31.06 to read as follows:
 Sec. 31.06.  PUBLIC CONSUMPTION. (a)  This section applies
 only to the holder of a caterer's permit operating under the permit
 in an area in a municipality that:
 (1) has a population of less than 15,000;
 (2)  is located in a county with a population of less
 than 65,000; and
 (3)  contains a historic preservation district that
 borders a lake.
 (b)  Notwithstanding any other law, the holder of a caterer's
 permit operating under the permit in an area located on property
 owned by a municipality that contains a municipally owned
 conference center and that borders a lake may permit a patron to
 leave the area, even though the patron possesses an alcoholic
 beverage, if:
 (1)  the beverage is in an open container and appears to
 be possessed for present consumption; and
 (2)  the public consumption of alcoholic beverages or
 possession of an open container of an alcoholic beverage is not
 prohibited on the municipally owned property where the area is
 located.
 (c)  This section does not affect the prohibition against
 possessing an open container in a passenger area of a motor vehicle
 under Section 49.031, Penal Code.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *