Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2349 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Ogden S.B. No. 2349
 (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2009; March 31, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Business and Commerce;
 April 24, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 6, Nays 0; April 24, 2009,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2349 By: Watson


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to distributed generation of electric power by natural gas
 powered generation facilities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 31.002, Utilities Code, is amended by
 adding Subdivision (4-a) and amending Subdivision (10) to read as
 follows:
 (4-a) "Distributed natural gas generation facility"
 means a facility installed on the customer's side of the meter that
 is used for the generation of not more than 2,000 kilowatts of
 electricity.
 (10) "Power generation company" means a person,
 including a person who owns or operates a distributed natural gas
 generation facility, that:
 (A) generates electricity that is intended to be
 sold at wholesale;
 (B) does not own a transmission or distribution
 facility in this state other than an essential interconnecting
 facility, a facility not dedicated to public use, or a facility
 otherwise excluded from the definition of "electric utility" under
 this section; and
 (C) does not have a certificated service area,
 although its affiliated electric utility or transmission and
 distribution utility may have a certificated service area.
 SECTION 2. The heading to Subchapter B, Chapter 35,
 Utilities Code, is amended to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER B. EXEMPT WHOLESALE GENERATORS, DISTRIBUTED NATURAL GAS
 GENERATION FACILITIES, AND POWER MARKETERS
 SECTION 3. Subchapter B, Chapter 35, Utilities Code, is
 amended by adding Section 35.036 to read as follows:
 Sec. 35.036.  DISTRIBUTED NATURAL GAS GENERATION
 FACILITIES. (a)  A person who owns or operates a distributed
 natural gas generation facility may sell electric power generated
 by the facility. The electric utility, electric cooperative, or
 retail electric provider that provides retail electricity service
 to the facility shall:
 (1)  purchase electric power tendered to it by the
 owner or operator of the facility at a fair market value price; or
 (2)  allow the owner or operator of the facility to use
 the transmission and distribution facilities to transmit the
 electric power to another market that is acceptable to the owner or
 operator in accordance with commission rules.
 (b)  A distributed natural gas generation facility must
 comply with emissions limitations established by the Texas
 Commission on Environmental Quality for a standard emissions permit
 for an electric generation facility unit installed after January 1,
 1995.
 SECTION 4. Subsection (c), Section 39.351, Utilities Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (c) The commission may establish simplified filing
 requirements for distributed natural gas generation facilities [A
 power generation company may register any time after September 1,
 2000].
 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *