Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB238 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: West S.B. No. 238
 (In the Senate - Filed November 10, 2008; February 11, 2009,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental
 Relations; March 30, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 4, Nays 0;
 March 30, 2009, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 238 By: West


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the availability of a property owners' association's
 books and records.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 209.005, Property Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsections (c) and (d) to read
 as follows:
 (a) A property owners' association shall make the books and
 records of the association, including financial records,
 reasonably available to an owner in accordance with Section B,
 Article 2.23, Texas Non-Profit Corporation Act (Article 1396-2.23,
 Vernon's Texas Civil Statutes), or a successor to that statute.
 (c)  In addition to the requirements of Subsection (a), a
 property owners' association shall maintain a copy of the
 association's books and records, including financial records and
 invoices in a building:
 (1)  in which the books and records are appropriately
 stored and which is accessible to members of the association during
 regular business hours; and
 (2) located:
 (A)  on property commonly owned by the association
 within the boundaries of the subdivision governed by the
 association; or
 (B)  if a building described by this subsection
 does not exist on property described by Paragraph (A):
 (i)  in a municipality or extraterritorial
 jurisdiction of a municipality in which all or part of the
 subdivision is located or in whose extraterritorial jurisdiction
 the subdivision is located; or
 (ii)  if the subdivision is not located in a
 municipality or extraterritorial jurisdiction of a municipality,
 in a county in which all or part of the subdivision is located.
 (d)  If a property owners' association subject to Subsection
 (a) fails to comply with Subsection (a), an owner may seek one or
 more of the following remedies:
 (1)  a court order directing the property owners'
 association to provide the required information;
 (2)  a judgment against the property owners'
 association for a penalty of not more than $1,500;
 (3)  a judgment against the property owners'
 association for court costs and attorney's fees incurred in
 connection with seeking a remedy under this section; or
 (4)  a judgment authorizing the owner or the owner's
 assignee to deduct the amounts awarded under Subdivisions (2) and
 (3) from any future regular or special assessments payable to the
 property owners' association.
 SECTION 2. Subsection (d), Section 209.005, Property Code,
 as added by this Act, applies only to a property owners'
 association's failure to comply with Subsection (a), Section
 209.005, Property Code, on or after the effective date of this Act.
 A property owners' association's failure to comply with that
 subsection before the effective date of this Act is governed by the
 law in effect immediately before the effective date of this Act, and
 that law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect January 1, 2010.
 * * * * *