Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2381 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: West S.B. No. 2381
 (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2009; March 31, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Government Organization;
 April 23, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 5,
 Nays 0; April 23, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the fee charged for registration on the master bidders
 list.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 2155.266, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 2155.266. REGISTRATION AND RENEWAL FEE. (a) The
 comptroller [commission] may charge a person applying for
 registration on the master bidders list a registration fee and may
 charge a registrant a biennial renewal fee in an amount designed to
 recover the comptroller's [commission's] costs in:
 (1) making and maintaining the master bidders list;
 and
 (2) soliciting bids or proposals under this
 subchapter.
 (b) In addition to the fee provided by Subsection (a), the
 comptroller shall also collect $20 from each registrant to be used
 for the purpose of enforcing compliance with requirements of state
 purchasing statutes and the prevention of fraud in the historically
 underutilized businesses program as set forth in Chapter 2161 [The
 commission shall set the amount of the fees by rule].
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *