Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2391 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Shapleigh S.B. No. 2391
 (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2009; March 31, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on International Relations and
 Trade; April 17, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 6, Nays 0;
 April 17, 2009, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2391 By: Gallegos


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the management and control of certain utility systems.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subsection (a), Section 1502.070, Government
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (a) Management and control of a utility system may be vested
 in:
 (1) the municipality's governing body; or
 (2) a board of trustees named in the proceedings
 adopted by the municipality and consisting of not more than:
 (A) five members, one of whom must be the mayor of
 the municipality; or
 (B)  seven members, one of whom must be the mayor
 of the municipality, if the municipality is located in a county:
 (i)  with a population of at least 600,000;
 and
 (ii)  that is located on an international
 border.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *