Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2423 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 2423


 AN ACT
 relating to the transfer or sale of patient information or
 prescription drug history by discount health care programs;
 providing penalties.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subdivisions (3) and (4), Section 76.001, Health
 and Safety Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (3) "Discount health care program" means a business
 arrangement or contract in which an entity, in exchange for fees,
 dues, charges, or other consideration, offers its members access to
 discounts on health care services provided by health care
 providers. The term does not include an insurance policy,
 certificate of coverage, or other product regulated by the Texas
 Department of Insurance or a self-funded or self-insured employee
 benefit plan. For purposes of this subsection, consideration
 includes patient information or patient prescription drug history
 provided by members, if the entity engages in the transfer or sale
 of such patient information, patient prescription drug history, or
 drug manufacturer rebates.
 (4) "Discount health care program operator" means a
 person who, in exchange for fees, dues, charges, or other
 consideration, operates a discount health care program and
 contracts with providers, provider networks, or other discount
 health care program operators to offer access to health care
 services at a discount and determines the charge to members. For
 purposes of this subsection, consideration includes patient
 information or patient prescription drug history provided by
 members, if the person engages in the transfer or sale of such
 patient information, patient prescription drug history, or drug
 manufacturer rebates.
 SECTION 2. Section 76.053, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (a-1) and amending Subsection (b) to
 read as follows:
 (a-1)  If a program operator engages in the transfer or sale
 of a member's patient information or patient prescription drug
 history, the program operator shall, before enrollment, provide
 each prospective member disclosure materials describing the
 program operator's practices regarding such transfer or sale.
 (b) A marketer shall use disclosure materials that comply
 with this section [Subsection (a)].
 SECTION 3. Title 21, Insurance Code, is amended by adding
 Chapter 7002 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 7002. SUPPLEMENTAL PROVISIONS RELATING TO DISCOUNT HEALTH
 CARE OPERATORS
 Sec. 7002.001.  DEFINITION. For purposes of Chapters 562
 and 7001, Insurance Code, consideration provided to a discount
 health care program or a discount health care program operator
 includes patient information or patient prescription drug history
 provided by members, if the entity engages in the transfer or sale
 of such patient information, patient prescription drug history, or
 drug manufacturer rebates.
 Sec. 7002.002.  REQUIRED DISCLOSURE. If a discount health
 care program operator engages in the transfer or sale of a member's
 patient information or patient prescription drug history, the
 program operator shall, before enrollment, provide each
 prospective member disclosure materials describing the program
 operator's practices regarding such transfer or sale.
 Sec. 7002.003.  VIOLATION; PENALTIES. A violation of this
 chapter may be enforced in the same manner as a violation of Chapter
 562 or 7001.
 SECTION 4. (a) Sections 1 and 2 of this Act take effect
 only if House Bill No. 4341 or Senate Bill No. 2339, Acts of the 81st
 Legislature, Regular Session, 2009, or another Act of the 81st
 Legislature, Regular Session, 2009, enacting Chapter 562 and Title
 21, Insurance Code, concerning discount health care programs is not
 enacted or does not become law.
 (b) Section 3 of this Act takes effect only if House Bill No.
 4341 or Senate Bill No. 2339, Acts of the 81st Legislature, Regular
 Session, 2009, or another Act of the 81st Legislature, Regular
 Session, 2009, enacting Chapter 562 and Title 21, Insurance Code,
 concerning discount health care programs is enacted and becomes
 law.
 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2423 passed the Senate on
 May 1, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0;
 May 21, 2009, Senate refused to concur in House amendments and
 requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 23, 2009, House
 granted request of the Senate; May 30, 2009, Senate adopted
 Conference Committee Report by the following vote: Yeas 31,
 Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2423 passed the House, with
 amendments, on May 15, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 144,
 Nays 0, one present not voting; May 23, 2009, House granted request
 of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee;
 May 28, 2009, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the
 following vote: Yeas 141, Nays 0, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor