By: Hinojosa S.B. No. 2469 (In the Senate - Filed March 26, 2009; March 31, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on Jurisprudence; May 8, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 8, 2009, sent to printer.) COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2469 By: Watson A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to the creation of two additional county courts at law in Hidalgo County. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Subsection (a), Section 25.1101, Government Code, is amended to read as follows: (a) Hidalgo County has the following statutory county courts: (1) County Court at Law No. 1 of Hidalgo County; (2) County Court at Law No. 2 of Hidalgo County; (3) County Court at Law No. 4 of Hidalgo County; (4) County Court at Law No. 5 of Hidalgo County; [and] (5) County Court at Law No. 6 of Hidalgo County; (6) County Court at Law No. 7 of Hidalgo County; and (7) County Court at Law No. 8 of Hidalgo County. SECTION 2. (a) The County Court at Law No. 7 of Hidalgo County is created on the effective date of this Act. (b) Notwithstanding Subdivision (7), Subsection (a), Section 25.1101, Government Code, as added by this Act, the County Court at Law No. 8 of Hidalgo County is created on September 1, 2012. SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2011. * * * * *