Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2484 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Ogden S.B. No. 2484
 (In the Senate - Filed April 1, 2009; April 6, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Finance; April 24, 2009,
 reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 10, Nays 0;
 April 24, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the transfer of certain state property from the Texas
 Department of Transportation to the Parks and Wildlife Department.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. (a) Not later than December 31, 2009, the Texas
 Department of Transportation shall transfer to the Parks and
 Wildlife Department the real property described by Subsection (d)
 of this section.
 (b) The consideration for the transfer authorized by
 Subsection (a) of this section is the requirement that the Parks and
 Wildlife Department use the property transferred only for a public
 park, a purpose that benefits the public interest of the state. If
 the Parks and Wildlife Department no longer uses the property for a
 public park, ownership of the property automatically reverts to the
 Texas Department of Transportation.
 (c) The Texas Department of Transportation shall transfer
 the property by an appropriate instrument of transfer, executed on
 its behalf by the Commissioner of the General Land Office. The
 instrument of transfer must:
 (1) include a provision that:
 (A) requires the Parks and Wildlife Department to
 use the property for a public park, a purpose that benefits the
 public interest of the state;
 (B) allows the Parks and Wildlife Department to
 lease the property described by Subsection (d) of this section to
 the Williamson County Parks and Recreation Department for use as a
 public park; and
 (C) indicates that ownership of the property
 automatically reverts to the Texas Department of Transportation if
 the Parks and Wildlife Department no longer uses the property for a
 public park; and
 (2) describe the property to be transferred by metes
 and bounds.
 (d) The real property to which Subsection (a) of this
 section refers is described as follows:
 A tract of land situated in the Damon Survey, Abstract No. 170, in
 Williamson County, Texas, being all of that called 6.180 acre tract
 of land (Tract 7), as shown on that unrecorded plat prepared by KC
 Engineering dated July 18, 1994, on ten (10) tracts of land out of
 that called 780.508 acre tract of land conveyed to the State of
 Texas, State Department of Highways and Public Transportation, by
 instrument recorded in Volume 1723, Page 855, of the Official
 Records of Williamson County, Texas.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *