Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2505 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Harris S.B. No. 2505
 (In the Senate - Filed April 6, 2009; April 8, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 April 28, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0; April 28, 2009,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2505 By: Deuell


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to safety of children who participate in rodeos.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subtitle A, Title 9, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Chapter 768 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 768. CHILDREN PARTICIPATING IN RODEOS
 Sec. 768.001. DEFINITIONS. In this chapter:
 (1)  "Bull riding helmet" means a rodeo helmet that is
 designed to provide substantial protection for a person's head and
 face during bull riding.
 (2) "Child" means a person under 18 years of age.
 (3)  "Department" means the Department of State Health
 Services.
 (4)  "Executive commissioner" means the executive
 commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission.
 (5)  "Protective vest" means protective clothing that
 covers a person's chest and torso to prevent or mitigate injury to
 those areas.
 (6)  "Rodeo" means an exhibition or competition,
 without regard to whether the participants are compensated,
 involving activities related to cowboy skills, including:
 (A)  riding a horse, with or without a saddle,
 with the goal of remaining on the horse while it attempts to throw
 off the rider;
 (B) riding a bull;
 (C)  roping an animal, including roping as part of
 a team;
 (D) wrestling a steer; and
 (E)  riding a horse in a pattern around preset
 barrels or other obstacles.
 (7)  "Rodeo helmet" means headgear that is designed to
 provide protection for a person's head during a rodeo activity
 other than bull riding.
 Sec. 768.002.  PROTECTIVE GEAR REQUIRED FOR CHILDREN
 PARTICIPATING IN CERTAIN RODEO ACTIVITIES. (a)  A child may not
 participate in:
 (1)  a rodeo activity described by Section
 768.001(6)(A) or (D) unless the child wears a rodeo helmet; or
 (2)  bull riding unless the child wears a bull riding
 helmet and a protective vest.
 (b)  A parent or legal guardian of the child may not
 knowingly or recklessly permit the child to participate in:
 (1)  a rodeo activity described by Section
 768.001(6)(A) or (D) unless the child is wearing a rodeo helmet; or
 (2)  bull riding unless the child is wearing a bull
 riding helmet and protective vest.
 (c)  To satisfy the requirements of this section, a helmet or
 protective vest must meet the standards adopted under Section
 768.004.
 (d)  In a cause of action in which damages are sought for
 injuries or death suffered by a child in connection with a rodeo
 activity, including bull riding, the failure of the child or of the
 parent or legal guardian of the child to comply with this chapter
 does not constitute responsibility causing or contributing to the
 cause of the child's injuries or death for purposes of Chapter 33,
 Civil Practice and Remedies Code.
 Sec. 768.003.  RODEOS ASSOCIATED WITH SCHOOL. (a)  This
 section applies only to a primary or secondary school that
 sponsors, promotes, or otherwise is associated with a rodeo in
 which children who attend the school are likely to participate.
 (b)  A primary or secondary school to which this section
 applies shall, not more than 14 days before each rodeo associated
 with the school, conduct a mandatory educational program on safety,
 including the proper use of protective gear, for children planning
 to participate in the rodeo. The educational program may consist of
 an instructional video, subject to department approval.
 (c)  A child may not participate in a rodeo associated with
 the child's school unless the child completes the educational
 program under this section not more than 14 days before the first
 day of the rodeo.
 Sec. 768.004.  RULES. (a)  The executive commissioner by
 rule shall adopt standards for:
 (1) rodeo helmets;
 (2) bull riding helmets; and
 (3) protective vests.
 (b)  For purposes of this section, the executive
 commissioner may adopt standards established under federal law or
 adopted by a federal agency or a nationally recognized
 organization.
 (c)  The executive commissioner shall adopt rules
 establishing requirements for the educational program under
 Section 768.003.
 SECTION 2. (a) The change in law made by this Act applies
 only to a rodeo activity that occurs on or after January 1, 2010.
 (b) The executive commissioner of the Health and Human
 Services Commission shall adopt the rules required by Section
 768.004, Health and Safety Code, as added by this Act, not later
 than November 1, 2009.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *