Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2513 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 2513


 AN ACT
 relating to the name and confirmation of, and to certain fees
 imposed by, the McLennan County Groundwater Conservation District
 and to the authority to create certain adjacent groundwater
 conservation districts.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. The heading to Chapter 8821, Special District
 Local Laws Code, is amended to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 8821. SOUTHERN TRINITY [MCLENNAN COUNTY]
 GROUNDWATER CONSERVATION DISTRICT
 SECTION 2. Subdivision (3), Section 8821.001, Special
 District Local Laws Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (3) "District" means the Southern Trinity [McLennan
 County] Groundwater Conservation District.
 SECTION 3. Section 8821.002, Special District Local Laws
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 8821.002. NATURE OF DISTRICT. The district is a
 groundwater conservation district in McLennan County created under
 and essential to accomplish the purposes of Section 59, Article
 XVI, Texas Constitution. The district is located in a priority
 groundwater management area designated by the Texas Commission on
 Environmental Quality pursuant to Section 35.008, Water Code.
 SECTION 4. Section 8821.024, Special District Local Laws
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 8821.024. INITIAL DIRECTORS. (a) The [If creation of
 the district is confirmed at an election held under Section
 8821.023, the] temporary directors are [become] the initial
 directors and serve for the terms provided by Subsection (b).
 (b) The initial directors representing commissioners
 precincts 2 and 4 serve a term expiring on December 31, 2011
 [following the expiration of two years after the date of the
 confirmation election], and the initial directors representing
 commissioners precincts 1 and 3 and the at-large director serve a
 term expiring on December 31, 2013 [following the expiration of
 four years after the date of the confirmation election].
 SECTION 5. Section 8821.025, Special District Local Laws
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 8821.025. EXPIRATION OF SUBCHAPTER. This subchapter
 expires December 31, 2013 [September 1, 2012].
 SECTION 6. Section 8821.152, Special District Local Laws
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 8821.152. DISTRICT REVENUES. (a)  The district by
 rule, resolution, or order may establish, amend, pledge, encumber,
 expend the proceeds from, and assess to any person fees for services
 or production fees based on the amount of groundwater authorized by
 permit to be withdrawn from a well, or on the amount of water
 actually withdrawn, to enable the district to fulfill its purposes
 and regulatory functions as provided by this chapter. The district
 may use revenues generated by fees it assesses for any lawful
 purpose.
 (b)  Notwithstanding any provision of general law to the
 contrary, a fee authorized by Subsection (a) may not exceed:
 (1)  $1 per acre-foot annually for groundwater used for
 agricultural purposes; or
 (2)  30 cents per thousand gallons annually for
 groundwater used for nonagricultural purposes.
 (c)  Notwithstanding any provision of general law or this
 chapter to the contrary, if any, the district may assess a
 production fee under this section for groundwater produced from a
 well or class of wells exempt from permitting under Section 36.117,
 Water Code, except for a well exempt from permitting under Section
 36.117(b)(1), Water Code. A production fee assessed by the
 district under this subsection must be based on the amount of
 groundwater actually withdrawn from the well and may not exceed the
 amount established by the district for permitted uses under
 Subsection (b)(2) of this section [FEES.     The district may impose a
 user fee to pay for the creation and operation of the district,
 including permit hearings. The district may not impose a fee for
 agricultural use that is more than 20 percent of the rate for
 municipal use].
 SECTION 7. The following provisions of the Special District
 Local Laws Code are repealed:
 (1) Subsection (c), Section 8821.021; and
 (2) Sections 8821.003 and 8821.023.
 SECTION 8. Notwithstanding Sections 35.012 and 36.0151,
 Water Code, the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality shall
 not, before September 1, 2011, create a groundwater conservation
 district:
 (1) in the priority groundwater management area in
 which the Southern Trinity Groundwater Conservation District is
 located; or
 (2) in a priority groundwater management area that is
 adjacent to the priority groundwater management area in which the
 Southern Trinity Groundwater Conservation District is located.
 SECTION 9. (a) The legal notice of the intention to
 introduce this Act, setting forth the general substance of this
 Act, has been published as provided by law, and the notice and a
 copy of this Act have been furnished to all persons, agencies,
 officials, or entities to which they are required to be furnished
 under Section 59, Article XVI, Texas Constitution, and Chapter 313,
 Government Code.
 (b) The governor, one of the required recipients, has
 submitted the notice and Act to the Texas Commission on
 Environmental Quality.
 (c) The Texas Commission on Environmental Quality has filed
 its recommendations relating to this Act with the governor, the
 lieutenant governor, and the speaker of the house of
 representatives within the required time.
 (d) All requirements of the constitution and laws of this
 state and the rules and procedures of the legislature with respect
 to the notice, introduction, and passage of this Act are fulfilled
 and accomplished.
 SECTION 10. This Act takes effect immediately if it
 receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each
 house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.
 If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate
 effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2513 passed the Senate on
 April 30, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0;
 May 28, 2009, Senate refused to concur in House amendment and
 requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 30, 2009, House
 granted request of the Senate; May 31, 2009, Senate adopted
 Conference Committee Report by the following vote: Yeas 31,
 Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2513 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 19, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 145,
 Nays 0, one present not voting; May 30, 2009, House granted request
 of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee;
 May 31, 2009, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the
 following vote: Yeas 143, Nays 0, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor