S.B. No. 2534 AN ACT relating to the creation of an interagency task force on economic growth and endangered species; providing information and direction regarding endangered species issues in certain areas of the state. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Subtitle F, Title 4, Government Code, is amended by adding Chapter 490E to read as follows: CHAPTER 490E. TASK FORCE ON ECONOMIC GROWTH AND ENDANGERED SPECIES Sec. 490E.001. PURPOSE. The purpose of this chapter is to establish a mechanism for state agencies to provide policy and technical assistance regarding compliance with endangered species laws and regulations to local and regional governmental entities and their communities engaged in economic development activities so that compliance with endangered species laws and regulations is as effective and cost efficient as possible. Sec. 490E.002. DEFINITIONS. In this chapter: (1) "Endangered species" has the meaning assigned by Section 68.002, Parks and Wildlife Code. (2) "Task force" means the interagency task force on economic growth and endangered species created under this chapter. Sec. 490E.003. CREATION. (a) The task force on economic growth and endangered species is created and is composed of: (1) the comptroller; (2) the commissioner of agriculture; (3) the executive director of the Parks and Wildlife Department; (4) the executive director of the Texas Department of Transportation; and (5) the executive director of the State Soil and Water Conservation Board. (b) The comptroller is the presiding officer of the task force. (c) The task force shall meet as often as necessary to fulfill its duties under this chapter. (d) New members may be added to the task force by the unanimous consent of the existing members. (e) A member of the task force may designate another person to act on the member's behalf. Sec. 490E.004. FUNCTIONS AND DUTIES. (a) The task force may: (1) assess the economic impact on the state of federal, state, or local regulations relating to endangered species; (2) assist landowners and other persons in this state to identify, evaluate, and implement cost-efficient strategies for mitigation of impacts to and recovery of endangered species that will promote economic growth and development in this state; and (3) facilitate state and local governmental efforts to effectively implement endangered species regulations in a cost-efficient manner. (b) If requested by a local government or a state official, the task force may review state and local governmental efforts to address endangered species issues and provide recommendations to make those efforts more cost effective. The task force shall consider all available options as part of its recommendations. The options considered must include: (1) fee simple acquisition of land; (2) conservation easements; (3) use of land owned by local governments or this state; (4) recovery crediting; and (5) all relevant federal programs. Sec. 490E.005. ADVISORY COMMITTEES. (a) With the advice of the task force, the comptroller may create advisory committees to assist the task force with its work. Of the members of an advisory committee: (1) one-third must be representatives of affected landowners; (2) one-third must be representatives of conservation interests; and (3) one-third must be representatives of municipalities or other affected jurisdictions. (b) The composition of an advisory committee must provide the balance necessary to address economic, environmental, and policy issues related to the specific issue or action under consideration. (c) The comptroller shall designate one member of an advisory committee as interim presiding officer for the purpose of calling and conducting the initial meeting of the committee. (d) An advisory committee shall: (1) at its initial meeting, select a presiding officer from among its members for the purpose of conducting meetings; (2) conduct meetings as necessary to perform the business of the advisory committee; and (3) provide recommendations to the task force as requested by the task force. (e) Chapter 2110 does not apply to the size, composition, or duration of an advisory committee created under this section. Sec. 490E.006. COORDINATION WITH OTHER ENTITIES. (a) The task force shall work in coordination with the United States Fish and Wildlife Service, institutions of higher education, and agriculture and conservation organizations in performing its functions and duties. (b) The Texas A&M University System shall, within its expertise: (1) assist in the analysis of biological and economic impacts of proposed actions; and (2) direct programs recommended by the task force. Sec. 490E.007. REPORTS. The task force may provide reports as needed on: (1) innovative programs to address endangered species issues while promoting economic growth; (2) the activities of the task force; and (3) recommendations for future programs or legislation. Sec. 490E.008. ADMINISTRATIVE SUPPORT. The comptroller's office shall provide administrative support to the task force. SECTION 2. (a) In this section: (1) "Endangered Species Act" means the federal Endangered Species Act of 1973 (16 U.S.C. Section 1531 et seq.). (2) "Task force" has the meaning assigned by Section 490E.002, Government Code, as added by this Act. (b) Not later than the 30th day after the effective date of this Act, the comptroller of public accounts shall create an advisory committee to assist the task force in identifying cost-efficient and effective recommendations for economic development and Endangered Species Act compliance in the Camp Bullis area in Bexar County. (c) Not later than October 31, 2009, the task force, with input from the advisory committee created under Subsection (b) of this section, shall provide a recommendation on a specific, coordinated program of work to assist Camp Bullis in accomplishing its training missions in a manner consistent with applicable endangered species regulations and programs. (d) Not later than January 15, 2011, the task force shall provide a report to the legislature on the activities of the task force and the status of efforts to mitigate harm to and efforts toward recovery of endangered species at Camp Bullis. (e) The advisory committee created under this section is abolished on the completion of its duties as determined by the task force. SECTION 3. This Act does not make an appropriation. A provision in this Act that creates a new governmental program, creates a new entitlement, or imposes a new duty on a governmental entity is not mandatory during a fiscal period for which the legislature has not made a specific appropriation to implement the provision. SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2009. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2534 passed the Senate on May 7, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2534 passed the House on May 26, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 143, Nays 2, one present not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House Approved: ______________________________ Date ______________________________ Governor