Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2565 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Averitt S.B. No. 2565
 (In the Senate - Filed April 28, 2009; April 29, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Business and Commerce;
 May 6, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 6,
 Nays 0; May 6, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to adjustments of rates of certain telecommunications
 utilities for changes in certain tax liabilities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 53.202, Utilities Code, is repealed.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *