Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2569 House Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    81R33830 HLT-D
 By: Lucio S.B. No. 2569
 Substitute the following for S.B. No. 2569:
 By: Guillen C.S.S.B. No. 2569


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the governing body of the Willacy County Navigation
 District.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Chapter 404, Acts of the 53rd Legislature,
 Regular Session, 1953, is amended by adding Sections 1A, 1B, and 1C
 to read as follows:
 Sec. 1A. In this Act:
 (1)  "Board" means the board of navigation and canal
 commissioners of the district.
 (2) "Commissioner" means a member of the board.
 (3)  "District" means the Willacy County Navigation
 District.
 Sec. 1B.  (a)  The board shall divide the territory of the
 district into four numbered single-member districts for electing
 commissioners.
 (b)  The board may revise the single-member districts as
 necessary or appropriate.
 (c)  The board consists of five commissioners.  One
 commissioner is elected from each single-member district, and one
 commissioner is elected from the district at large.
 (d) Commissioners serve staggered four-year terms.
 (e)  The commissioner elected from the district at large
 serves as the presiding officer of the board.
 Sec. 1C.  The board shall hold an election to elect the
 appropriate number of commissioners on the uniform election date in
 November of each even-numbered year.
 SECTION 2. (a) In this section, "board," "commissioner,"
 and "district" have the meanings assigned by Section 1A, Chapter
 404, Acts of the 53rd Legislature, Regular Session, 1953, as added
 by this Act.
 (b) Not later than June 1, 2010, the board shall divide the
 territory of the district into four numbered single-member
 districts as required by Section 1B, Chapter 404, Acts of the 53rd
 Legislature, Regular Session, 1953, as added by this Act.
 (c) A commissioner of the district who is serving on the day
 before the effective date of this Act shall serve until a successor
 qualifies following an election under Subsection (d) of this
 section.
 (d) On the uniform election date in November 2010, the board
 shall hold an election to elect one at-large commissioner and four
 commissioners from single-member districts.
 (e) The five commissioners elected under Subsection (d) of
 this section shall draw lots to determine which two commissioners
 shall serve a term expiring December 1, 2012, and which three
 commissioners shall serve a term expiring December 1, 2014.
 (f) On the uniform election date in November 2012, the board
 shall hold an election to elect two commissioners to terms of four
 years.
 (g) On the uniform election date in 2014, the board shall
 hold an election to elect three commissioners to terms of four
 years.
 SECTION 3. (a) The legal notice of the intention to
 introduce this Act, setting forth the general substance of this
 Act, has been published as provided by law, and the notice and a
 copy of this Act have been furnished to all persons, agencies,
 officials, or entities to which they are required to be furnished
 under Section 59, Article XVI, Texas Constitution, and Chapter 313,
 Government Code.
 (b) The governor, one of the required recipients, has
 submitted the notice and Act to the Texas Commission on
 Environmental Quality.
 (c) The Texas Commission on Environmental Quality has filed
 its recommendations relating to this Act with the governor, the
 lieutenant governor, and the speaker of the house of
 representatives within the required time.
 (d) All requirements of the constitution and laws of this
 state and the rules and procedures of the legislature with respect
 to the notice, introduction, and passage of this Act are fulfilled
 and accomplished.
 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.