Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2573 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Ogden S.B. No. 2573
 (In the Senate - Filed May 4, 2009; May 4, 2009, read first
 time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services;
 May 8, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 5,
 Nays 0, 1 present not voting; May 8, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to annual reports by certain agencies conducting, funding,
 or supporting biomedical research.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subtitle H, Title 2, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Chapter 172 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 172. BIOMEDICAL RESEARCH
 Sec. 172.001.  DEFINITION. In this chapter, "state agency"
 means a department, commission, board, office, or other agency in
 the executive branch of state government created by the state
 constitution or a state statute, including an institution of higher
 education as defined by Section 61.003, Education Code.
 Sec. 172.002.  ANNUAL REPORT. (a)  Not later than December
 1 of each year, a state agency that conducts, funds, or supports
 biomedical research shall submit to the governor, the Legislative
 Budget Board, and the commissioner of state health services a
 report, in the format established by the commissioner, on whether
 the agency conducted, funded, or supported during the preceding
 state fiscal year any research that involves stem cells or human
 cloning.
 (b)  A state agency that conducts, funds, or supports any
 research that involves stem cells or human cloning must include in
 the report submitted under Subsection (a) information on:
 (1)  the type of research conducted, funded, or
 supported by the state agency that involves:
 (A)  stem cells, including embryonic,
 nonembryonic somatic, and induced pluripotent stem cells; and
 (B)  human cloning, including therapeutic and
 reproductive cloning;
 (2)  the process through which the stem cells and stem
 cell lines were derived, if applicable;
 (3)  the amount and source of state money used to
 conduct, fund, or support the research;
 (4)  the use of state facilities to conduct or support
 the research; and
 (5) the progress and results of the research.
 SECTION 2. Not later than December 1, 2009, a state agency
 that conducts, funds, or supports biomedical research shall submit
 the initial report required under Chapter 172, Health and Safety
 Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *